No. 17-1136
Title:The Protestant Episcopal Church in the Diocese of South Carolina, et al., Petitioners
v.
The Episcopal Church, et al.
Docketed:February 13, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of South Carolina
   Case Numbers:(27731)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 17, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Feb 13 2018Waiver of right of respondent The Episcopal Church in South Carolina to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 14 2018Waiver of right of respondent The Episcopal Church to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Feb 27 2018Response Requested. (Due March 29, 2018)
Mar 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2018 to April 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 30, 2018, for all respondents.
Mar 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Professors Randy Beck et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2018Brief amici curiae of The Falls Church Anglican, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: The Protestant Episcopal Church in the Diocese of South Carolina, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mary E. Kostel
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

mkostel@goodwinlaw.com
202-346-4184
Party name: The Episcopal Church
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3680
Party name: The Episcopal Church in South Carolina
Other
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1700 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@winston.com
(202) 282-5000
Party name: Professors Randy Beck et al.
Scott John Ward
    Counsel of Record
Gammon & Grange
8280 Greensboro Drive
Suite 140
McLean, VA 22102-3807

SJW@GG-Law.com
703-761-5012
Party name: The Falls Church Anglican, et al.