No. 17-1130
Vide 17-7295
Title:Theodore E. Okechuku, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 12, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-10386)
   Decision Date:October 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 8, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 14, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 14, 2018 to April 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 13, 2018.
Apr 02 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 17 2018Reply of petitioner Theodore E. Okechuku filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Theodore E. Okechuku
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States