No. 17-1112
Title:Connecticut, Petitioner
Quavon Torres
Docketed:February 7, 2018
Lower Ct:Appellate Court of Connecticut
   Case Numbers:(AC 39796)
   Decision Date:August 1, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:November 9, 2017
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2018Waiver of right of respondent Quavon Torres to respond filed.
Feb 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Michigan, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2018Petition DENIED.

Attorneys for Petitioner
Laurie Nadine Feldman
    Counsel of Record
Appellate Bureau
Office of the Chief State's Attorney
300 Corporate Place
Rocky Hill, CT 06067
Party name: Connecticut
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Barbara Smith
    Counsel of Record
Bansley Anthony Burdo, LLC
265 Orange Street
New Haven, CT 06510
Party name: Quavon Torres
Aaron David Lindstrom
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
525 West Ottawa Street, 7th Floor
Lansing, MI 48909
Party name: Michigan, et al.