No. 17-1110
Title:Paul A. Slough, et al., Petitioners
United States
Docketed:February 7, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3078, 15-3079, 15-3080, 15-3081)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2018 to April 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 9, 2018.

Attorneys for Petitioners
Bruce C. Bishop
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1330 Connecticut Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036
Party name: Paul A. Slough, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
Party name: United States