No. 17-1107 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Mike Carpenter, Interim Warden, Petitioner
v.
Patrick Dwayne Murphy
Docketed:February 7, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(07-7068, 15-7041)
   Decision Date:November 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 9, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2018 to April 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 9, 2018.
Mar 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Environmental Federation of Oklahoma, Inc., et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Mar 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of Oklahoma Independent Petroleum Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States of America filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 09 2018Brief of respondent Patrick Dwayne Murphy in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2018Reply of petitioner Terry Royal, Warden filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018Petition GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
May 23 2018Motion of Terry Royal, Warden for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (June 20, 2018)
Jun 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended and including July 23, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 7, 2018.
Jun 20 2018Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Jul 23 2018Brief of petitioner Mike Carpenter, Interim Warden filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 23 2018Joint appendix (2 volumes) filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Letter of July 23, 2018, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Main Document
Jul 30 2018Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Oklahoma Independent Petroleum Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Oklahoma Sheriffs’ Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Nebraska, Kansas, Louisiana, Michigan, Montana, South Dakota, Texas, Utah, Wyoming, and Paul R. LePage, Governor of Maine filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Environmental Federation of Oklahoma, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States of America filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 27 2018Motion for a further extension of time filed.
Main Document
Aug 27 2018Response of Mike Carpenter, Interim Warden to motion not accepted for filing. (To be resubmitted - August 29, 2018)
Aug 27 2018Response to motion from petitioner Mike Carpenter, Interim Warden filed.
Main Document
Aug 29 2018Motion for a further extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted in part, and the time is extended to and including September 19, 2018.
Sep 19 2018Brief of respondent Patrick Dwayne Murphy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 26 2018Brief amici curiae of David Boren, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Congress of American Indians filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Historians, Legal Scholars, and Cherokee Nation filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Muscogee (Creek) Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Former United States Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2018Joint motion of respondent and Muscogee (Creek) Nation for leave for Muscogee (Creek) Nation to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 26 2018Brief amici curiae of National Indigenous Women's Resource Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, November 27, 2018
Oct 09 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch and Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Oct 15 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit.
Oct 19 2018CIRCULATED
Oct 19 2018Reply of petitioner Mike Carpenter, Interim Warden filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of 5 Boxes of Pleadings.
Oct 26 2018Joint motion of respondent and Muscogee (Creek) Nation for leave for Muscogee (Creek) Nation to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

lisa.blatt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Mike Carpenter, Interim Warden
Attorneys for Respondent
Patti Palmer Ghezzi
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
215 Dean A. McGee
Suite 707 Old Post Office Building
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Patti_Ghezzi@fd.org
405-609-5975
Party name: Patrick Dwayne Murphy
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Lynn H. Slade
    Counsel of Record
Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk, P.A.
500 Fourth Street N.W., Suite 1000
Albuquerque, NM 87102

lynn.slade@modrall.com
505-848-1800
Party name: Environmental Federation of Oklahoma, Inc., et al.
Robert David Cheren
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
2000 Key Tower, 127 Public Square
Cleveland, OH 44114

rcheren@bakerlaw.com
2168616648
Party name: The Oklahoma Sheriffs’ Association, the Oklahoma District Attorneys Association, District Attorney O.R. Barris III, District Attorney Paul B. Smith, District Attorney Max Cook, District Attorney Orvil Loge, District Attorney Jack Thorpe, District Attorney Steve Kunzweiler, District Attorney Jeff Smith, District Attorney Chuck Sullivan, District Attorney Matt Ballard, and District Attorney Mike Fields
Troy A. Eid
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig
1200 17th Street
Suite 2400
Denver, CO 80202

eidt@gtlaw.com
3035726521
Party name: Former United States Attorneys Troy A. Eid, Barry R. Grissom, Thomas B. Heffelfinger, David Iglesias, Brendan V. Johnson, Wendy J. Olson, Timothy Q. Purdon and Danny C. Williams, Sr.
Blaine H. Evanson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

bevanson@gibsondunn.com
213-229-7000
Party name: Oklahoma Independent Petroleum Association
Robert Harlan Henry
    Counsel of Record
Robert H Henry Law Firm
512 North Broadway Ave, Suite 230
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

rh@rhhenrylaw.com
405-516-7824
Party name: David Boren, et al.
Riyaz Amir Kanji
    Counsel of Record
Kanji & Kantzen, PLLC
303 Detroit St
Ste 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

rkanji@kanjikatzen.com
734-769-5400
Party name: Muscogee (Creek) Nation
David Andrew Lopez
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Nebraska Attorney General
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509

dave.lopez@nebraska.gov
4024713882
Party name: States of Nebraska, Kansas, Louisiana, Michigan, Montana, South Dakota, Texas, Utah, Wyoming, and Paul R. LePage, Governor of Maine
Mary Kathryn Nagle
    Counsel of Record
Pipestem Law, P.C.
320 South Boston Ave, Suite 1705
Tulsa, OK 74103

mknagle@pipestemlaw.com
2024070591
Party name: National Indigenous Women's Resource Center
Chrissi Ross Nimmo
    Counsel of Record
Cherokee Nation
PO Box 1533
Tahlequah, OK 74465-1533

chrissi-nimmo@cherokee.org
9184586998
Party name: Historians, Legal Scholars, and Cherokee Nation
Colette Routel
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Hamline School of Law
875 Summit Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55105

colette.routel@mitchellhamline.edu
6512906327
Party name: National Congress of American Indians
Sarah M. Shalf
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
Gambrell Hall
1301 Clifton Road NE
Atlanta, GA 30322-2770

sarah.shalf@emory.edu
404-712-4652
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, the International City/County Management Association, and the National Sheriffs’ Association