No. 17-1106
Title:Michael Sexton, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Nicholas Beaudreaux
Docketed:February 7, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15345)
   Decision Date:September 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 8, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Brief of respondent Nicholas Beaudreaux in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent.
Main Document
Mar 27 2018Reply of petitioner Michael Sexton, Warden filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 12 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 18 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 26 2018Rescheduled.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 09 2018Rescheduled.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 16 2018Rescheduled.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 23 2018Rescheduled.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
May 30 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 06 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 13 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 28 2018Petition GRANTED. Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Justice Breyer dissents. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peggy S. Ruffra
    Counsel of Record
Department of Justice
Office of the California Attorney General
455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Peggy.Ruffra@doj.ca.gov
4155103855
Party name: Michael Sexton, Warden
Attorneys for Respondent
Jamie Lee Moore
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
700 Larkspur Landing Circle
Suite 199
Larkspur, CA 94939

fedappeal@yahoo.com
(415) 272-2772
Party name: Nicholas Beaudreaux