No. 17-1104
Title:Air and Liquid Systems Corp., et al., Petitioners
v.
Roberta G. DeVries, Individually and as Administratrix of the Estate of John B. DeVries, Deceased, et al.
Docketed:February 7, 2018
Linked with 17A625
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2602, 16-2669)
   Decision Date:October 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 08 2017Application (17A625) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2018 to February 1, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 11 2017Application (17A625) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 31, 2018.
Jan 31 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Air and Liquid Systems Corp., et al..
Blanket Consent
Mar 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2018 to March 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2018.
Mar 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Brief of respondents Roberta G. DeVries, Executrix of the Estate of John B. Devries, Deceased, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2018Reply of petitioners Air and Liquid Systems Corp., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition GRANTED.
May 23 2018Motion for an extension of time to file joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 9, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 20, 2018.
Jul 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT On Wednesday, October 10, 2018
Jul 09 2018Brief of petitioners Air and Liquid Systems Corp., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2018Joint appendix filed (2 volumes). (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain Document
Jul 09 2018Brief of respondent General Electric Co. in support of petitioners filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of Richard A. Epstein filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Amicus brief of Coalition for Litigation Justice, Inc., et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Amicus brief of Product Liability Advisory Counsel, Inc. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Amicus brief of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: Air and Liquid Systems Corp., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Phillips Myers
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Reich & Myers
1608 Walnut Street
Suite 500
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rmyers@prmpclaw.com
215-735-9200
Party name: Roberta G. DeVries, Individually and as Administratrix of the Estate of John B. DeVries, Deceased, et al.
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: General Electric Co.
Other
James M. Beck
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
Three Logan Square, Suite 3100
1717 Arch Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103-2713

jmbeck@reedsmith.com
215-851-8100
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Counsel, Inc.
Mark Alan Behrens
    Counsel of Record
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
1155 F Street NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

mbehrens@shb.com
202-783-8400
Party name: Coalition for Litigation Justice, Inc., et al.
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

jbucholtz@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Nevin Merrill Gewertz
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP
Courthouse Place, 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60654

nevin.gewertz@bartlit-beck.com
(312) 494-4400
Party name: Richard A. Epstein