No. 17-1098
Title:John C. Parkinson, Petitioner
v.
Department of Justice
Docketed:February 6, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3066)
   Decision Date:October 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 8, 2018 to April 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 9, 2018.
Mar 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2018 to May 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 08 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2018Brief amici curiae of Michael German, Robert Kobus, Jane Turner, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 9, 2018.
May 09 2018Brief of respondent Department of Justice in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 23 2018Reply of petitioner John C. Parkinson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: John C. Parkinson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Justice
Other
Gregory Jacob Dubinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor
New York, NY 10019

gdubinsky@hsgllp.com
6468375132
Party name: Michael German, Robert Kobus, Jane Turner, et al.
Michael J. Lockerby
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
3000 K Street, N.W., Suite 600
Washington, DC 20007

mlockerby@foley.com
202-945-6079
Party name: The Rutherford Institute