No. 17-1094
Title:Nutraceutical Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Troy Lambert
Docketed:February 5, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-56423)
   Decision Date:September 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 01 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 7, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2018Waiver of right of respondent Troy Lambert to respond filed.
Feb 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 07 2018Response Requested. (Due April 6, 2018)
Mar 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2018 to June 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2018.
May 14 2018Brief of respondent Troy Lambert in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2018Reply of petitioner Nutraceutical Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 16 2018Motion of Nutraceutical Corporation for an extension of time submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Charles Hueston
    Counsel of Record
Hueston Hennigan LLP
523 West 6th Street
Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90014

jhueston@hueston.com
(213) 788-4340
Party name: Nutraceutical Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Ronald Albert Marron
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Ronald A. Marron
651 Arroyo Drive
San Diego, CA 92103

ron@consumersadvocates.com
619-696-9006
Party name: Troy Lambert