No. 17-1091
Title:Tyson Timbs, Petitioner
v.
Indiana
Docketed:February 2, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Indiana
   Case Numbers:(27S04-1702-MI-70)
   Decision Date:November 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 31 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Tyson Timbs, et al. and Respondent Indiana.
Blanket Consent
Feb 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 4, 2018.
Feb 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 5, 2018 to May 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amici curiae of The Southern Poverty Law Center and The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2018Brief of respondent State of Indiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2018Reply of petitioner Tyson Timbs filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jun 26 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including September 4, 2018.
Jul 12 2018Blanket Consent received from counsel of record for petitioner filed.
Blanket Consent
Jul 12 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Tyson Timbs.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Blanket Consent received from counsel of record for Respondent, State of Indiana filed.
Blanket Consent
Aug 24 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Sep 04 2018Brief of petitioner Tyson Timbs filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Amicus brief of Judicial Watch, Inc.; Allied Educational Foundation not accepted for filing. (To be resubmitted with correct documentation - September 10, 2018)
Sep 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2018Brief amici curiae of Eighth Amendment Scholars in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2018Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Juvenile Law Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Amicus brief of Indiana Criminal Defense Lawyers not accepted for filing. (Duplicate submission - September 12, 2018)
Sep 11 2018Amicus brief of Indiana Criminal Defense Lawyers not accepted for filing. (Duplicate submission - September 12, 2018)
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Indiana Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Drug Policy Alliance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2018Amicus brief of Cause of Action Institute not accepted for filing. (To be re-submitted with correction)
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of DKT Liberty Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cause of Action Institute filed (Re-submitted with correction on September 14, 2018).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2018Brief of respondent State of Indiana filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, November 28, 2018
Oct 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 19 2018CIRCULATED
Nov 02 2018Record received from the Supreme Court of Indiana is electronic and complete.
Nov 05 2018Reply of petitioners Tyson Timbs, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Wesley Patrick Hottot
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
600 University Street
Suite 1730
Seattle, WA 98101

whottot@ij.org
206-957-1300
Party name: Tyson Timbs, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana
Other
Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

nchoudhury@aclu.org
212-519-7876
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Bert W. Rein
    Counsel of Record
WILEY REIN LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

brein@wileyrein.com
202- 719-7000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Lawrence Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Chapman University, Fowler School of Law
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

rosentha@chapman.edu
714-628-2650
Party name: National League of Cities et al.
Averil Budge Rothrock
    Counsel of Record
Schwabe. Williamson & Wyatt. P.C.
1420 Fifth Avenue. Suite*3400
Seattle, WA 98101

arothrock@schwabe.com
206-622-1711
Party name: The Southern Poverty Law Center and The Cato Institute
Eugene Volokh
    Counsel of Record
Scott & Cyan Banister Clinic
UCLA School of Law
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

volokh@law.ucla.edu
310-206-3926
Party name: Scholars
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: DKT Liberty Project, Cato Institute, Goldwater Institute, Due Process Institute, Federal Bar Association Civil Rights Law Section, and Texas Public Policy Foundation
Robert M. Carlson
    Counsel of Record
Corette Pohlman, et al.
129 W. Park
Butte, MT 59701

abapresident@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
124 S. West Street
Suite 201
Alexandria, VA 22314

adickerson@ifs.org
7038946846
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3342621245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Chris Fedeli
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street SW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 22204

cfedeli@judicialwatch.org
2026465185
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.; Allied Educational Foundation
Daniel Scott Harawa
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund
700 14th Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

dharawa@naacpldf.org
2022165563
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Dorothy Alicia Hickok
    Counsel of Record
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
One Logan Square
Philadelphia, PA 19103

alicia.hickok@dbr.com
215-988-3364
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Kenneth Alan Klukowski
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Rights Union
3213 Duke Street #625
Alexandria, VA 22314

kklukowski@theacru.org
4694407584
Party name: American Civil Rights Union
Marsha Levick
    Counsel of Record
Juvenile Law Center
1315 Walnut Street, 4th Fl.
Philadelphia, PA 19107

mlevick@jlc.org
215-625-0551
Party name: Juvenile Law Center et al.
Christina Marie Martin
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
8645 N. Military Trail
Suite 511
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

cmartin@pacificlegal.org
5616915000
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
David Schulmeister
    Counsel of Record
Cades Schutte, LLP
1000 Bishop Street, 12th Floor
Honolulu, HI 96813

nmclean@cades.com
808 521 9392
Party name: Eighth Amendment Scholars
William Bruce Shields
    Counsel of Record
Blank Rome
1825 Eye St NW
Washington, DC 20006

wshields@blankrome.com
2027725817
Party name: Indiana Criminal Defense Lawyers
Daniel Martin Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

dsullivan@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: DRUG POLICY ALLIANCE, THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY, THE BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NYU SCHOOL OF LAW, FREEDOMWORKS FOUNDATION, THE LAW ENFORCEMENT ACTION PARTNERSHIP, AND OTHERS
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1875 Eye Street, N.W., Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

john.vecchione@causeofaction.org
2024992415
Party name: Cause of Action Institute