No. 17-1090
Title:Petro-Hunt, LLC, Petitioner
United States
Docketed:February 2, 2018
Linked with 17A644
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1981, 2016-1983)
   Decision Date:July 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2017Application (17A644) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2018 to February 1, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 15 2017Application (17A644) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 1, 2018.
Feb 01 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 5, 2018 to April 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 4, 2018.

Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Ralph White
    Counsel of Record
White Andrews, LLC
650 Poydras Street
Suite 2319
New Orleans, LA 70130
Party name: Petro-Hunt, L.L.C.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
Party name: United States