No. 17-1089
Title:Michael Leslie Lake, Petitioner
Michael Skelton
Docketed:February 2, 2018
Linked with 17A580
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-13124)
   Decision Date:November 3, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:September 28, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2017Application (17A580) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 27, 2017 to January 31, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 28 2017Application (17A580) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 31, 2018.
Jan 31 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Michael Leslie Lake.
Blanket Consent
Mar 05 2018Brief of respondent Michael Skelton in opposition filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Southern Center for Human Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2018Reply of Michael Leslie Lake submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 19 2018Proof of Service of Michael Leslie Lake submitted.
Main Document
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.

Attorneys for Petitioner
Naveen Ramachandrappa
    Counsel of Record
Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, LLP
1201 W Peachtree St NW Ste 3900
Atlanta, GA 30309
Party name: Michael Leslie Lake
Attorneys for Respondent
George M. Weaver
    Counsel of Record
Hollberg & Weaver, LLP
2921 Piedmont Road
Suite C
Atlanta, GA 30305
Party name: Michael Skelton
Adam Howard Charnes
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201
Party name: The Southern Center for Human Rights
Kellye Chaloult Moore
    Counsel of Record
Walker, Hulbert,Gray & Moore. LLP
909 Ball Street P.0. Box1770
Perry, GA 31069
Party name: Georgia Sheriffs' Association, Inc.