No. 17-1077
Title:Francis V. Lorenzo, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:January 31, 2018
Linked with 17A657
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1202)
   Decision Date:September 29, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2017Application (17A657) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 28, 2017 to January 26, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 19 2017Application (17A657) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 26, 2018.
Jan 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 2, 2018 to April 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 2, 2018.
Mar 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2018 to May 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 2, 2018.
May 02 2018Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
May 23 2018Reply of petitioner Francis V. Lorenzo filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 20, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 5, 2018.
Jul 31 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 20 2018Brief of petitioner Francis V. Lorenzo filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 27 2018Amicus brief of Securities Law Professors not accepted for filing. (Duplicate submission - September 10, 2018)
Aug 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Securities Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOtherOther
Oct 05 2018Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 05 2018Motion to argue pro hac vice filed by respondent Securities and Exchange Commission.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 3, 2018
Oct 12 2018Brief amicus curiae of The North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 15 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit.
Oct 19 2018CIRCULATED
Oct 19 2018Justice Kavanaugh is recused in this case.
Oct 26 2018Motion to argue pro hac vice filed by respondent GRANTED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Nov 01 2018Reply of petitioner Francis V. Lorenzo filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert G. Heim
    Counsel of Record
Meyers & Heim LLP
1350 Broadway, Suite 514
New York, NY 10018

rheim@meyersandheim.com
2123557188
Party name: Francis V. Lorenzo
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission
Other
Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
88 Pine Street. 14th Floor
New York, NY 10005

meisenkraft@cohenmilstein.com
212-838-7797
Party name: North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc.
Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kakowuah@sidley.com
202 736 8739
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Lyle Roberts
    Counsel of Record
Shearman & Sterling LLP
401 9th Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20004

lyle.roberts@shearman.com
202 508-8108
Party name: Securities Law Professors