No. 17-1060
Title:United States, ex rel. Benjamin Carter, Petitioner
v.
Halliburton Co., et al.
Docketed:January 29, 2018
Linked with 17A547
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1262)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 28, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2017Application (17A547) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2017 to January 25, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 16 2017Response to application from respondent Halliburton, Co., et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 21 2017Application (17A547) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 25, 2018.
Jan 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2018)
PetitionPetitionPetitionPetition
Jan 31 2018Brief of respondents Halliburton Co., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2018Reply of petitioner United States, ex rel. Benjamin Carter filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 05 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Apr 05 2018Letter of counsel for Benjamin Carter to Clerk filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David S. Stone
    Counsel of Record
Stone & Magnanini LLP
100 Connell Dr
Suite 2200
Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922

dstone@stonemagnalaw.com
(973) 218-1111
Party name: United States, ex rel. Benjamin Carter
Attorneys for Respondents
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 500 - West
Washington, DC 20037

jelwood@velaw.com
202-639-6518
Party name: Halliburton Co., et al.