No. 17-1058
Title:SNR Wireless LicenseCo, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Communications Commission, et al.
Docketed:January 29, 2018
Linked with 17A544
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1330, 15-1331, 15-1332, 15-1333)
   Decision Date:August 29, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2017Application (17A544) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 27, 2017 to January 26, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Nov 21 2017Application (17A544) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 26, 2018.
Jan 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of Public Interest Organizations filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Feb 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2018 to March 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 30, 2018.
Mar 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2018 to April 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 30, 2018.
Apr 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2018 to May 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 21, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Christopher J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Harris, Wiltshire & Grannis, LLP
1919 M Street, NW, Fl. 8
Washignton, DC 20036

cwright@hwglaw.com
2023331325
Party name: SNR Wireless LicenseCo, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Communications Commission, et al.
Other
Lawrence Jay Spiwak
    Counsel of Record
Phoenix Center for Advanced Legal & Economic Public Policy Studies
5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW
Suite 440
Washington, DC 20015

lspiwak@phoenix-center.org
(202) 274-0235
Party name: Public Interest Organizations