No. 17-1042
Title:BNSF Railway Company, Petitioner
v.
Michael D. Loos
Docketed:January 25, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3355, 16-1123)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 26, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 26, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 06 2018Waiver of right of respondent Michael Loos to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 21 2018Response Requested. (Due March 23, 2018)
Feb 26 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Association of American Railroads.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Brief of respondent Michael Loos in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2018Reply of petitioner BNSF Railway Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Association of American Railroads GRANTED.
May 14 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jun 05 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 20, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 10, 2018.
Jul 06 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Michael Loos.
Blanket Consent
Jul 20 2018Brief of petitioner BNSF Railway Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jul 20 2018Joint appendix and supplemental volume filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Railroads filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 20 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 6, 2018
Sep 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Sep 10 2018Brief of respondent Michael Loos filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 12 2018CIRCULATED
Sep 13 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Brief amici curiae of SMART and ARLA filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit. 1 Box, the record is complete.
Oct 01 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 10 2018Reply of petitioner BNSF Railway Company filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2018Letter of the United States filed. (Distributed).
Main Document
Nov 06 2018Argued. For petitioner: Lisa S. Blatt, Washington, D. C.; and Rachel P. Kovner, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: David C. Frederick, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

lisa.blatt@arnoldporter.com
202-679-5257
Party name: BNSF Railway Company
Charles Glaston ColeSteptoe & Johnson, LLP
1330 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

ccole@steptoe.com
202-429-6720
Party name: BNSF Railway Company
Attorneys for Respondent
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Michael Loos
Michael Armin WolffSchlichter Bogard & Denton LLP
100 South Street
Suite 1200
Saint Louis, MO 63102

mwolff@uselaws.com
3146216115
Party name: Michael Loos
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Robert P. Marcus
    Counsel of Record
Kujawski & Associates, PC
1331 Park Plaza Drive
Suite 2
O'Fallon, IL 62269

bmarcus@kujawskimarcus.com
6186223600
Party name: SMART and ARLA
Daniel Saphire
    Counsel of Record
Association of Amer. Railroads
425 3rd Street. N.W.
Washington, DC 20024

dsaphire@aar.org
202-639-2505
Party name: Association of American Railroads
Jeffrey Robert White
    Counsel of Record
American Association for Justice
777 6th Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20001-3723

jeffrey.white@justice.org
2029442839
Party name: American Association for Justice