No. 17-1026
Title:Gilberto Garza, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Idaho
Docketed:January 24, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Idaho
   Case Numbers:(44991)
   Decision Date:November 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Waiver of right of respondent State of Idaho to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Ethics Bureau at Yale filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 08 2018Response Requested. (Due April 9, 2018)
Mar 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2018 to June 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 16 2018Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioner Gilberto Garza, Jr. filed.
Main Document
Mar 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part, and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2018.
May 08 2018Brief of respondent State of Idaho in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Reply of petitioner Gilberto Garza, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jun 21 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 10, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 17, 2018.
Jul 17 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Gilberto Garza, Jr.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 10 2018Brief of petitioner Gilberto Garza, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Ethics Bureau at Yale filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 30, 2018
Aug 24 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Sep 10 2018Record requested from the Supreme Court of Idaho.
Sep 12 2018CIRCULATED
Sep 17 2018Brief of respondent State of Idaho filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 24 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 24 2018Brief amici curiae of Louisiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Oct 17 2018Reply of petitioner Gilberto Garza, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2018Argued. For petitioner: Amir H. Ali, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Kenneth K. Jorgensen, Lead Deputy Attorney General, Boise, Idaho; and Allon Kedem, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
718 7th St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Gilberto Garza, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kenneth K. Jorgensen
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General - State of ID
Statehouse Room 210
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010

ken.jorgensen@ag.idaho.gov
208-334-2400
Party name: State of Idaho
Other
Lawrence J. Fox
    Counsel of Record
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

lawrence.fox@yale.edu
203-432-9358
Party name: The Ethics Bureau at Yale
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: UNITED STATES
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Louisiana, et al.
Lauren Marguerite Weinstein
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W. Suite 660
Washington, DC 20037

lweinstein@mololamken.com
202-556-2000
Party name: Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al.
John J. KorzenWake Forest University School of Law
P. O. Box 7206
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
3367585832
Party name: Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute