No. 17-1011
Title:Budha Ismail Jam, et al., Petitioners
v.
International Finance Corporation
Docketed:January 22, 2018
Linked with 17A606
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-7051)
   Decision Date:June 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 26, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 01 2017Application (17A606) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 25, 2017 to January 25, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
Dec 11 2017Application (17A606) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 25, 2018.
Jan 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2018 to March 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 09 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Budha Ismail Jam, et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2018.
Feb 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of International Law Scholars filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 23, 2018 to March 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 30, 2018.
Mar 30 2018Brief of respondent International Finance Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
Apr 18 2018Reply of petitioners Budha Ismail Jam, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jun 15 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 27 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Budha Ismail Jam, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 13, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2018.
Jul 02 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, International Finance Corporation.
Blanket Consent
Jul 03 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Budha Ismail Jam, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 09 2018Motion for a further extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 24 2018Motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is further extended to and including July 24, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is further extended to and including September 10, 2018.
Jul 24 2018Brief of petitioners Budha Ismail Jam, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 31 2018Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 31 2018Brief amici curiae of Professors of International Organization and International Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 31 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 31 2018Brief amici curiae of Center for International Environmental Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of ServiceProof of Service
Aug 20 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 31, 2018
Sep 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. Dist. of Columbia Circuit.
Sep 10 2018Brief of respondent International Finance Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 12 2018CIRCULATED
Sep 17 2018Brief amici curiae of International Law Experts filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Member Countries and the Multilateral Investment Guarantee Agency filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Former Secretaries of State and Secretaries of the Treasury filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Branch Attorneys filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 17 2018Brief amici curiae of International Bank for Reconstruction and Development, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Brief amici curiae of African Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Oct 01 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 05 2018Reply of petitioners Budha Ismail Jam, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2018Justice Kavanaugh is recused in this case.
Oct 31 2018Argued. For petitioners: Jeffrey L. Fisher, Stanford, Cal.; and Jonathan Ellis, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
650-724-1900
Party name: Budha Ismail Jam, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: International Finance Corporation
Francis A. Vasquez Jr.White & Case LLP
701 13th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

fvasquez@whitecase.com
202-626-3600
Party name: International Finance Corporation
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: USA
William Joseph Aceves
    Counsel of Record
225 Cedar Street
San Diego, CA 92101-3090

wja@cwsl.edu
619-515-1589
Party name: International Law Scholars
Jonathan I. Blackman
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

jblackman@cgsh.com
212-225-2490
Party name: African Union, et al.
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Multilateral Investment Guarantee Agency
Jonathan Saul Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US, LLP
799 9th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com
2026620466
Party name: Former Executive Branch Attorneys
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: International Bank for Reconstruction and Development, et al.
Nikesh Jindal
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

njindal@kslaw.com
202-383-8933
Party name: Bipartisan Members of Congress
Lawrence H. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag LLP
1717 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

lhm@foleyhoag.com
2022617395
Party name: INTERNATIONAL LAW EXPERTS
Stephen Michael Nickelsburg
    Counsel of Record
Clifford Chance US LLP
2001 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

steve.nickelsburg@cliffordchance.com
202-912-5000
Party name: FORMER SECRETARIES OF STATE AND SECRETARIES OF THE TREASURY, JAMES A. BAKER, III TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER, JOHN F. KERRY, JACOB J. LEW HENRY, M. PAULSON, JR., ROBERT E. RUBIN, GEORGE P. SHULTZ, LAWRENCE H. SUMMERS
Patrick William Pearsall
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

PWPearsall@jenner.com
202-637-6393
Party name: Professors of International Organization and International Law
Henry C. Su
    Counsel of Record
Constantine Cannon LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 1300N
Washington, DC 20004-2579

hsu@constantinecannon.com
2022043504
Party name: Center for International Environmental Law, Accountability Counsel, Center for Constitutional Rights, Centre for Research on Multinational Corporations, Global Witness, Inclusive Development International, International Accountability Project, Erica R. Gould, and Jennifer M. Green