No. 17-1005
Title:Oath Holdings, Inc., Petitioner
Marianne Ajemian, et al.
Docketed:January 19, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(SJC-12237)
   Decision Date:October 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2018Brief of respondents Marianne Ajemian, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Facebook, Inc., et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2018Reply of petitioner Oath Holdings, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.

Attorneys for Petitioner
Marc J. Zwillinger
    Counsel of Record
ZwillGen PLLC
1900 M Street NW
Suite 250
Washington, DC 20036
Party name: Oath Holdings, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert L. Kirby Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Pierce & Mandell, P.C.
11 Beacon Street
Suite 800
Boston, MA 02109
Party name: Marianne Ajemian, et al.
John Randall Tyler
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Ave, Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98102
Party name: Facebook, Inc., et al.