No. 16-980
Title:Jon Husted, Ohio Secretary of State, Petitioner
v.
A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al.
Docketed:February 8, 2017
Linked with 16A556
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3746)
   Decision Date:September 23, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 02 2016Application (16A556) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 22, 2016 to February 6, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Dec 06 2016Application (16A556) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 6, 2017.
Feb 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 10, 2017)
Feb 03 2017Appendix of Jon Husted, Ohio Secretary of State filed.
Feb 27 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 31, 2017.
Mar 09 2017Brief amici curiae of Former Attorneys of the Civil Rights Division of the United States Department of Justice filed.
Mar 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Mar 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed.
Mar 10 2017Brief amici curiae of Georgia and 14 other States filed.
Mar 31 2017Brief of respondents A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al. in opposition filed.
Apr 17 2017Reply of petitioner Jon Husted, Ohio Secretary of State filed.
Apr 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 10 2017Rescheduled.
May 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 22 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 30 2017Petition GRANTED.
Jun 07 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Petitioner.
Jun 07 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Respondents.
Jun 22 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 31, 2017.
Jun 22 2017The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 15, 2017.
Jun 29 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by the parties.
Jul 31 2017Brief of petitioner Husted, Ohio Secretary of State filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Buckeye Institute filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Georgia and 16 Other States filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Former Attorneys of the Civil Rights Division of the United States Department of Justice filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed.
Aug 22 2017Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Aug 25 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by the parties GRANTED.
Aug 31 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday November 8, 2017
Sep 07 2017CIRCULATED
Sep 12 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Sep 15 2017Brief of respondents A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 19 2017Brief amici curiae of Libertarian Party of Ohio, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of American History Professors filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of Libertarian National Committee filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amici curiae of the League of Women Voters of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amici curiae of National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of Senator Sherrod Brown filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amici curiae of Certain Members of the Congressional Black Caucus filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amici curiae of National Disability Rights Network, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of Common Cause filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amici curiae of Eric H. Holder, Jr., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amici curiae of the States of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amici curiae of Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Ohio Elections Officials filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of VoteVets Action Fund filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 10 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 16 2017Reply of petitioner Jon Husted, Ohio Secretary of State filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Ohio State Solicitor
30 East Broad Street
17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215

eric.murphy@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
(614) 466-8980
Party name: Jon Husted, Ohio Secretary of State
Attorneys for Respondents
Brenda Wright
    Counsel of Record
1340 Centre Street, Suite 209
Newton, MA 02459

bwright@demos.org
(617) 232-5885
Party name: A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al.
Other
J. Christian Adams
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington Street, Suite 1675
Indianapolis, IN 46204

adams@publicinterestlegal.org
317-203-5599
Party name: American Civil Rights Union
Samuel Robert Bagenstos
    Counsel of Record
625 S. State St.
Ann Arbor, MI 48109

sbagen@gmail.com
734-647-7584
Party name: Eric H. Holder, Jr., et al.
Brigida Benitez
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1330 Connecticut Ave., N. W.
Washington, DC 20036

bbenitez@steptoe.com
202-429-3000
Party name: Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, et al.
Rachel Sarah Bloomekatz
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW, Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

Rachel@guptawessler.com
202-888-1741
Party name: Current and Former Ohio Elections Officials
Emmet J Bondurant
    Counsel of Record
Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, LLP
3900 One Atlantic Center
1201 W. Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

bondurant@bmelaw.com
(404) 881-4100
Party name: Common Cause
Thomas Mark Bondy
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

tbondy@orick.com
202 339-8400
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., et al.
Richard P. Bress
    Counsel of Record
Latkins & Watkins, LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

richard.bress@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: American History Professors
Gorod Brianne
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW, Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstition.org
292-296-6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Mark R. Brown
    Counsel of Record
303 East Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215-3200

mbrown@law.capital.edu
6142366590
Party name: Libertarian Party of Ohio, et al.
Michael A. Carvin
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Room 5639
Washington, DC 20001

macarvin@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: Buckeye Institute
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Former Attorneys of the Civil Rights Division of the United States Department of Justice
Gilda R. Daniels
    Counsel of Record
Advancement Project
1220 L Street, NW, Suite 850
Washington, DC 20005

gdaniels@advancementproject.org
202-728-9557
Party name: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, et al.
Joshua Paul Davis
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
811 Main Street
Suite 1700
Houston, TX 77002

jpdavis@reedsmith.com
713-469-3800
Party name: National Conference of State Legislatures, et al.
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Aderson Bellegarde Francois
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Public Representation, Georgetown Un
600 New Jersey Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

Abf48@law.georgetown.edu
202-662-9535
Party name: VoteVets Action Fund
John Arak Freedman
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Mass. Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.freedman@apks.com
202-942-5000
Party name: The League of Women Voters of the United States, et al.
Linda Ceilia Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Dechert, LLP
1095 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

linda.goldstein@dechert.com
212-698-3500
Party name: Certain Members of the Congressional Black Caucus
Jason David Hirsch
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 Grenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

jason.hirsch@wilmerhale.com
(212)-230-8800
Party name: Libertarian National Committee
Steven A. Hirsch
    Counsel of Record
Keker Van Nest & Peters, LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

shirsch@keker.com
(415)-391-5400
Party name: Senator Sherrod Brown
Richard Peter Hutchison
    Counsel of Record
3100 Broadway
Suite 1200
Kansas City, MO 64111

rpetehutch@aol.com
816-931-5559
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation, et al.
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
1250 Connecticut Avenue
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20036

lj@larryjoseph.com
202-355-9452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Michael Courtney Keats
    Counsel of Record
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038

mkeats@stroock.com
212-806-5400
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al.
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.,
Andrew Alan Pinson
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Solicitor
40 Capital Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

apinson@law.ga.gov
404-651-9365
Party name: Georgia and 16 Other States
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1411 K Street, NW, Suite 1400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: National Disability Rights Network, et al.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
120 Broadway, 25th Floor
New York, NY 10271-0332

barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
(212) 416-8020
Party name: for the States of New York, et al.
Timothy Allen ButlerOffice of the Attorney General
40 Capitol Square, SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

tbutler@law.ga.gov
(404) 656-3300
Party name: Georgia and 14 other States
Robert D. PopperJudicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.