No. 16-970
Title:Brandon Lance Rinehart, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:February 6, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S222620)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 9, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2017)
Feb 13 2017Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Feb 23 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 7, 2017.
Feb 24 2017Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Mar 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Western Mining Alliance, et al. filed.
Mar 08 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Exploration & Mining Association filed.
Apr 07 2017Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
Apr 19 2017Reply of petitioner Brandon Lance Rinehart filed.
Apr 25 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Calvin Wood
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3033 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

jw@pacificlegal.org
(202) 888-6881
Party name: Brandon Lance Rinehart
Attorneys for Respondent
Joshua A. Klein
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Solicitor General
CA Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
415-703-2543
Party name: California
Other
Paul J. Beard II.Alston & Bird LLP
1115 11th Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

paul.beard@alston.com
(916) 498-3354
Party name: Western Mining Alliance, et al.
Kimberly S. HermannSoutheastern Legal Foundation
2255 Sewell Mill Road, Suite 320
Marietta, GA 30062

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Steven J. LechnerMountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

lechner@mountainstateslegal.com
(303) 292-2021
Party name: American Exploration & Mining Association