No. 16-9695
Title:Jodi Lynn Richter, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 23, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1723)
   Decision Date:June 5, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 24, 2017)
Jul 20 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2017.
Aug 01 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 22, 2017.
Sep 22 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Oct 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 23 2017Rescheduled.
Nov 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven R. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
The Morrison Law Practice
1526 Robertson Court
Grand Forks, ND 58203

steven.r.morrison@gmail.com
(617)-749-7817
Party name: Jodi Lynn Richter
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States