No. 16-969
Title:SAS Institute Inc., Petitioner
v.
Joseph Matal, Interim Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al.
Docketed:February 3, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-1346, 2015-1347)
   Decision Date:June 10, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 7, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 6, 2017)
Feb 28 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 5, 2017.
Apr 05 2017Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
Apr 17 2017Reply of petitioner SAS Institute Inc. filed.
Apr 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 22 2017Petition GRANTED.
Jun 22 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 20, 2017.
Jun 22 2017The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 5, 2017.
Jul 20 2017Joint appendix filed. (2 Volumes) (Statement of costs filed)
Jul 20 2017Brief of petitioner SAS Institute Inc. filed.
Jul 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief of Federal Respondent filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief of respondent ComplementSoft, LLC filed.
Sep 12 2017Motion for divided argument filed by respondent ComplementSoft, LLC.
Sep 12 2017Brief amicus curiae of Houston Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Oct 05 2017Reply of petitioner SAS Institute Inc. filed.
Oct 06 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, November 27, 2017
Oct 10 2017Motion for divided argument filed by respondent DENIED.
Oct 12 2017CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory Andrew Castanias
    Counsel of Record
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

gcastanias@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: SAS Institute Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondent
Michael Kanovitz
    Counsel of Record
Loevy & Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen
Chicago, IL 60607

mike@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: ComplementSoft, LLC
Edwin S. KneedlerDeputy Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@usdoj.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: Joseph Matal, Interim Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al.
Other
Iftikhar Ahmed
    Counsel of Record
Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing, P.C.
1221 McKinney Street, Suite 2500
Houston, TX 77010

iftiahmed@azalaw.com
713-655-1101
Party name: Houston Intellectual Property Law Association
Lauren A. DegnanFish & Richardson, P.C.
901 15th Street, Suite 700
Washington, DC 20005

degnan@fr.com
(202) 783-5070
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association