No. 16-9672
Title:C.D., E.F., and G.H., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:June 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3318, 16-3024, 16-3033)
   Decision Date:February 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 22, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 24, 2017)
Jul 20 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2017.
Aug 14 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 22, 2017.
Sep 21 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 23, 2017.
Oct 23 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Nov 06 2017Reply of petitioner C.D., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paige A. Nichols
    Counsel of Record
Kansas Federal Public Defender, 117 SW 6th Ave., Suite 200
Topeka, KS 66603

paige_nichols@fd.org
(785) 232-9828
Party name: C.D., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States