No. 16-9649
Title:Cassandra Anne Kasowski, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 20, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1907, 16-1909)
   Decision Date:June 5, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 16 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 20, 2017)
Jul 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 21, 2017.
Aug 02 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 20, 2017.
Sep 20 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Oct 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 23 2017Rescheduled.
Nov 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven R. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
The Morrison Law Practice
1526 Robertson Court
Grand Forks, ND 58203

steven.r.morrison@gmail.com
(617)-749-7817
Party name: Cassandra Anne Kasowski
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Department of Justice
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States