No. 16-9604
Title:Trevon Sykes, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 19, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-3139)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 17, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 19, 2017)
Jun 28 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Jun 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jul 06 2017Response Requested. (Due August 7, 2017)
Aug 02 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2017.
Sep 06 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Sep 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 23 2017Reply of petitioner Trevon Sykes filed. (Distributed)
Sep 23 2017Motion to defer consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner Trevon Sykes.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Levell D. Littleton
    Counsel of Record
1221 Locust, Suite 310
St. Louis , MO 63103

levelllittleton@cs.com
(314) 231-3168
Party name: Trevon Sykes
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States