No. 16-9541 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Jeffrey Clark, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:June 13, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(2012-KA-0508)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 13, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 13, 2017)
Jul 13 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 14, 2017.
Aug 10 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 5, 2017.
Sep 07 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 11, 2017.
Sep 11 2017Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
Sep 20 2017Reply of petitioner Jeffrey Clark filed.
Sep 28 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 02 2017Letter of October 2, 2017, from counsel for petitioner received.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
G. Ben Cohen
    Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
636 Baronne Street
New Orleans, LA 70115

504-529-5955
Party name: Jeffrey Clark
Attorneys for Respondent
Juliet L. Clark
    Counsel of Record
Assistant District Attorney
200 Derbigny Street
Gretna, LA 70053

(504)-368-1020
Party name: Louisiana