No. 16-9493
Title:Florencio Rosales-Mireles, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 9, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-50151)
   Decision Date:March 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 10, 2017)
Jul 07 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 9, 2017.
Aug 09 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Aug 22 2017Reply of petitioner Florencio Rosales-Mireles filed. (Distributed)
Aug 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 28 2017Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Nov 09 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including November 29, 2017.
Nov 09 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 10, 2018.
Nov 29 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 29 2017Brief of petitioner Rosales-Mireles, Florencio filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 05 2017Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, February 21, 2018
Jan 05 2018CIRCULATED
Jan 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Jan 10 2018Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 09 2018Reply of petitioner Rosales-Mireles, Florencio filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Argued. For petitioner: Kristin L. Davidson, Assistant Federal Public Defender for Western Dist. of Tex., San Antonio, Tex. For respondent: Jonathan Ellis, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kristin L. Davidson
    Counsel of Record
727 E. Cesar E. Chavez Blvd., Suite B-207
San Antonio, TX 78206

Kristin_davidson@fd.org
(210) 472-6700
Party name: Rosales-Mireles, Florencio
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
John D. Cline
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of John D. Cline
One Embarcadero Center
Suite 500
San Francisco, CA 94111

cline@johndclinelaw.com
415-662-2260
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al.