No. 16-8966
Title:Abd al-Rahim al-Nashiri, Petitioner
v.
Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Docketed:May 1, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1023, 15-5020)
   Decision Date:August 30, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:October 19, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 31, 2017)
May 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 30, 2017.
May 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Institute of Military Justice filed.
May 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
May 31 2017Brief amici curiae of Retired Military Admirals and Generals, et al. filed.
May 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Coalition to Protect Civil Freedoms filed.
May 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of Physicians for Human Rights, Inc. filed.
May 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of Alberto Mora filed.
Jun 26 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 31, 2017.
Jul 27 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 31, 2017.
Aug 31 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 7, 2017.
Sep 07 2017Brief of respondent Trump, President of U.S., et al. in opposition filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michel Paradis
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Defense
Military Commissions Defense Organization
1620 Defense Pentagon
Washington, DC 20301-1620

michel.paradis@osd.mil
(703) 695-4672
Party name: Abd al-Rahim al-Nashiri
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Trump, President of U.S., et al.
Other
George M. ClarkeBaker & McKenzie, LLP
815 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

george.clarke@bakermckenzie.com
(202) 452-7000
Party name: Alberto Mora
Peter Erlinder1043 Grand Ave., Suite 228
St. Paul, MN 55105

proferlinder@gmail.com
(651) 271-4616
Party name: National Coalition to Protect Civil Freedoms
Linda A. KleinPresident
American Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
(312) 988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
David B. ToscanoDavis Polk & Wardwell, LLP
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

david.toscano@davispolk.com
(212) 450-4000
Party name: Retired Military Admirals and Generals, et al.
Stephen I. Vladeck727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
(512) 475-9198
Party name: National Institute of Military Justice
Sabin WillettMorgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
One Federal Street
Boston, MA 02110

sabin.willett@morganlewis.com
(617) 341-7700
Party name: Physicians for Human Rights, Inc.