No. 16-8255 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Robert Leroy McCoy, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:March 9, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(2014-KA-1449)
   Decision Date:October 19, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:December 6, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 10, 2017)
Mar 24 2017Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
Apr 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Ethics Bureau at Yale filed.
Apr 10 2017Brief amici curiae of The Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Apr 11 2017Reply of petitioner Robert Leroy McCoy filed. (Distributed)
Apr 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
Apr 24 2017Record Requested.
Jun 12 2017Record received from the Supreme Court of Louisiana (6 boxes).
Jun 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Sep 28 2017Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Nov 13 2017Brief of petitioner Robert L.McCoy filed (to be corrected and reprinted).
Nov 13 2017Joint appendix filed. (two volumes)
Main DocumentMain Document
Nov 13 2017Brief of petitioner Robert L. McCoy filed (Corrected brief received 1/10/18). (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 17 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, January 17, 2018
Nov 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amici curiae of Ten Law School Professors and the Ethics Bureau at Yale filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceProof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Criminal Bar Association of England & Wales filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2017CIRCULATED.
Dec 13 2017Brief of respondent Louisiana filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2017Record requested from the Supreme Court of Louisiana.
Dec 20 2017Brief amici curiae of States of Alabama, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Montana, Nevada, South Carolina, Tennessee, Utah, and Wyoming filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2018Reply of petitioner Robert L.McCoy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Argued. For petitioner: Seth P. Waxman, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Elizabeth Murrill, Solicitor General of Louisiana, Baton Rouge, La.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Robert L. McCoy
Richard John Bourke636 Baronne Street
New Orleans, LA 70113

rbourke@thejusticecenter.org
5042582915
Party name: Robert L.McCoy
Attorneys for Respondent
John Michael Lawrence
    Counsel of Record
Office of the District Attorney
204 Burt Boulevard, P.O. Box 69
Benton, LA 71006

(318)-965-2332
Party name: Louisiana
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Louisiana Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Louisiana
Other
Hilarie Bass
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60610

abapresident@americanbar.org
312-988-5109
Party name: American Bar Association
Lawrence J. Fox
    Counsel of Record
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven,, CT 06511

lawrence.fox@yale.edu
203-432-9358
Party name: Ten Law School Professors and the Ethics Bureau at Yale
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20002

cneily@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
Jenay Aretha Nurse-Guilford
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
30 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10112

jenay.nurse@squirepb.com
2012133137
Party name: THE CRIMINAL BAR ASSOCIATION OF ENGLAND & WALES
Lauren Ashley Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General State of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130

lsimpson@ago.state.al.us
3343531209
Party name: States of Alabama, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Montana, Nevada, South Carolina, Tennessee, Utah, and Wyoming
Clifford M. Sloan
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

cliff.sloan@skadden.com
202-371-7040
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
G. Ben CohenThe Promise of Justice Initiative
636 Baronne Street
New Orleans, LA 70113

bcohen@thejusticecenter.org
(504) 529-5955
Party name: The Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al.
Lawrence J. FoxVisiting Lecturer in Law
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

lawrence.fox@yale.edu
(203) 432-9358
Party name: The Ethics Bureau at Yale