No. 16-784
Title:Merit Management Group, LP, Petitioner
v.
FTI Consulting, Inc.
Docketed:December 20, 2016
Linked with 16A492
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3388)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:August 30, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2016Application (16A492) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2016 to December 19, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Nov 17 2016Application (16A492) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 19, 2016.
Dec 16 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2017)
Jan 19 2017Brief of respondent FTI Consulting, Inc. in opposition filed.
Feb 03 2017Reply of petitioner Merit Management Group, LP filed.
Feb 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 22 2017Rescheduled.
Feb 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Feb 27 2017Rescheduled.
Mar 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 13 2017Rescheduled.
Mar 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 20 2017Rescheduled.
Mar 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Mar 28 2017Rescheduled.
Apr 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
May 01 2017Petition GRANTED.
Jun 05 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 13, 2017.
Jun 05 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 11, 2017.
Jun 22 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party from counsel for the petitioner.
Jun 28 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party received from counsel for the respondent.
Jul 13 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Jul 13 2017Brief of petitioner Merit Management Group, LP filed.
Jul 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of Opportunity Partners, L.P. filed.
Jul 20 2017Brief amici curiae of Various Former Tribune and Lyondell Shareholders filed.
Aug 31 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 6, 2017
Sep 07 2017CIRCULATED
Sep 11 2017Brief of respondent FTI Consulting, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Tribune Company Retirees and Noteholders filed. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees filed. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Bankruptcy Law Professors Ralph Brubaker, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 06 2017Reply of petitioner Merit Management Group, LP filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Christopher Walsh
    Counsel of Record
211 N. Broadway, Suite 3600
St. Louis, MO 63102

brian.walsh@bryancave.com
314-259-2000
Party name: Merit Management Group, LP
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
202-879-5000
Party name: FTI Consulting, Inc.
Barbara Whiten BallietteReid Collins & Tsai LLP
1301 S. Capital of Texas Hwy.
Building C, Suite 300
Austin, TX 78746

bballeiette@rctlegal.com
(512) 647-6100
Party name: FTI Consulting, Inc.
Other
Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried
    Counsel of Record
Ganzfried Law
5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW Suite 440
Washington, DC 20015

JJG@ganzfriedlaw.com
(202) 486-2004
Party name: Bankruptcy Law Professors Ralph Brubaker, et al.
Lawrence Saul Robbins
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sa
1801 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
(202) 775-4500
Party name: Tribune Company Retirees and Noteholders
Bradford Jay Sandler
    Counsel of Record
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones
10100 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 1300
Los Angeles, CA 90067

bsandler@pszjlaw.com
310 277 6910
Party name: National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees
Philip D. AnkerWilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

philip.anker@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8890
Party name: Various Former Tribune and Lyondell Shareholders
Alan E. Golomb492 Bardini Drive
Melville, NY 11747

aandp492@aol.com
(516) 509-0509
Party name: Opportunity Partners, L.P.