No. 16-768
Title:Richard Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al., Petitioners
v.
John Does #1-5, et al.
Docketed:December 16, 2016
Linked with 16A482
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1536, 15-2346, 15-2486)
   Decision Date:August 25, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:September 15, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2016Application (16A482) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Nov 15 2016Application (16A482) denied by Justice Kagan.
Dec 14 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 17, 2017)
Dec 28 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 16, 2017.
Feb 16 2017Brief of respondents John Does #1-5, et al. in opposition filed.
Mar 06 2017Reply of petitioners Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al. filed.
Mar 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 27 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Jul 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jul 25 2017Supplemental brief of petitioners Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al. filed.
Jul 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Aaron D. Lindstrom
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

LindstromA@michigan.gov
(517) 373-1124
Party name: Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Miriam Aukerman
    Counsel of Record
ACLU Fund of Michigan
1514 Wealthy St., SE, Ste 242
Grand Rapids, MI 49506

maukerman@aclumich.org
(616) 301-0930
Party name: John Does #1-5, et al.
Paul D. ReingoldMichigan Clinical Law Program
University of Michigan Law School
801 Monroe Street
Ann Arbor, MI 48109

(734) 763-4319
Party name: John Does #1-5, et al.
Other
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States