No. 16-6855 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Marion Wilson, Petitioner
v.
Eric Sellers, Warden
Docketed:November 15, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-10681)
   Decision Date:August 23, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 15, 2016)
Dec 19 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 5, 2017.
Jan 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Adam K. Mortara, in support of respondent filed.
Jan 05 2017Brief of respondent Eric Sellers, Warden filed.
Jan 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 27 2017Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Adam K. Mortara, Esquire, of Chicago, Illinois, is invited to brief and argue, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below.
Mar 15 2017Letter from respondent regarding position in case. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2017In light of the letter filed by respondent on March 15, 2017, the order inviting Adam K. Mortara, Esquire to brief and argue, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below is withdrawn.
Apr 04 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 30, 2017.
May 19 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is further extended to and including June 5, 2017.
Jun 05 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Jun 05 2017Brief of petitioner Marion Wilson filed.
Jun 12 2017Brief amici curiae of Retired State Supreme Court Justices filed.
Jun 14 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 21, 2017.
Aug 21 2017Brief of respondent Eric Sellers, Warden filed.
Aug 28 2017Brief amici curiae of Arkansas, et al. filed.
Aug 31 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, October 30, 2017
Sep 07 2017CIRCULATED
Sep 12 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A.11th Circuit.
Sep 20 2017Reply of petitioner Marion Wilson filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Argued. For petitioner: Mark E. Olive, Tallahassee, Fla. For respondent: Sarah Hawkins Warren, Solicitor General of Georgia, Atlanta, Ga.
Nov 15 2017Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner Marion Wilson.
Main Document
Nov 20 2017Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Main Document
Dec 11 2017Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner GRANTED. , and Mark E. Olive, Esquire, of Tallahassee, Florida, is appointed to serve as counsel for the petitioner in this case.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian S. Kammer
    Counsel of Record
Georgia Resource Center
303 Elizabeth St., NE
Atlanta, GA 30307

brian.kammer@garesource.org
(404)-222-9202
Party name: Marion Wilson
Autumn N. Nero1 East Main Street, Suite 201
Madison, WI 53703

anero@perkinscoie.com
608-663-7460
Party name: Marion Wilson
Mark Evan OliveLaw Office of Mark E. Olive, P.A.
320 West Jefferson Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301

meolive@aol.com
850-224-0004
Party name: Marion Wilson
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Hawkins Warren
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Georgia
40 Capitol Square, SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

swarren@law.ga.gov
404-656-3300
Party name: Warden Sellers
Sabrina D. GrahamSenior Assistant Attorney General
State Law Department
40 Capitol Square, S.W.
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

sgraham@law.ga.gov
(404) 656-7659
Party name: Eric Sellers, Warden
Adam K. MortaraBartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP
54 W. Hubbard St., Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60654

adam.mortara@bartlit-beck.com
(312) 494-4400
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below
Other
Timothy P. O'TooleMiller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

totoole@milchev.com
(202) 626-5800
Party name: Retired State Supreme Court Justices
Lee Philip RudofskyOffice of the Attorney General
323 Center Street, Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

lee.rudofsky@arkansasag.gov
5016828090
Party name: Arkansas, et al.