No. 16-6795 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Carlos Manuel Ayestas, aka Dennis Zelaya Corea, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:November 9, 2016
Linked with 16A130
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-70015)
   Decision Date:March 22, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:June 10, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 05 2016Application (16A130) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 8, 2016 to October 24, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Aug 10 2016Application (16A130) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 24, 2016.
Oct 14 2016Application (16A130) to extend further the time from October 24, 2016 to November 7, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Oct 19 2016Application (16A130) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 7, 2016.
Nov 07 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 9, 2016)
Dec 05 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 9, 2017.
Dec 23 2016Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 8, 2017.
Feb 08 2017Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed.
Feb 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Feb 23 2017Reply of petitioner Carlos Manuel Ayestas, aka Dennis Zelaya Corea filed. (Distributed)
Mar 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Apr 03 2017Motion of petitioner to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari is GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition.
Apr 10 2017Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner Carlos Manuel Ayestas, aka Dennis Zelaya Corea.
May 05 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent.
May 05 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or either party from counsel for the petitioner.
May 12 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 9, 2017.
May 12 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 1, 2017.
May 16 2017Motion to appoint counsel DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
Jun 05 2017Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner GRANTED. and Lee B. Kovarsky, Esquire, of Baltimore, Maryland, is appointed to serve as counsel for the petitioner in this case.
Jun 09 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Jun 09 2017Brief of petitioner Carlos Manuel Ayestas, aka Dennis Zelaya Corea filed.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers,and The American Civil Liberties Union filed.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Constitution Project filed.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The American Bar Association filed.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Capital Punishment Center of the University of Texas at Austin School of Law filed.
Aug 01 2017Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Dept. of Criminal Justice, Correctional Division filed.
Aug 08 2017Brief amici curiae of States of Arizona, et al. filed.
Aug 31 2017Reply of petitioner Carlos Manuel Ayestas filed.
Aug 31 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, October 30, 2017
Sep 07 2017CIRCULATED
Sep 12 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A.5th Circuit.
Sep 28 2017Record received from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Texas - Brownsville Division is electronic.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lee Kovarsky
    Counsel of Record
University of Maryland, School of Law
500 West Baltimore St., Rm. 436
Baltimore, MD 21201-1786

lkovarsky@law.maryland.edu
(434)-466-8257
Party name: Carlos Manuel Ayestas
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott A Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Davis, Dir., TX DCJ
Jeremy C. GreenwellAssistant Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711-2548

jeremy.greenwell@oag.state.tx.us
(512) 936-1400
Party name: Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Other
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1275 W. Washington St.
Phoenix, AZ 85007

solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
602-542-3333
Party name: States of Arizona, et al.
Jessica Ring AmunsonJenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

jamunson@jenner.com
(202) 639-6000
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and the American Civil Liberties Union
Linda A. KleinPresident
American Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
(312) 988-5000
Party name: The American Bar Association
Eugene Alexis SokoloffHogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

eugene.sokoloff@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: The Constitution Project
Jordan SteikerCapital Punishment Center
University of Texas School of Law
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

jsteiker@law.uttexas.edu
(512) 232-1346
Party name: The Capital Punishment Center of the University of Texas at Austin School of Law