No. 16-6694 | |
Title: | Eric Jordan, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | November 2, 2016 |
Linked with 16A115 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (12-4825) |
Decision Date: | May 31, 2016 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 28 2016 | Application (16A115) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2016 to October 28, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Aug 03 2016 | Application (16A115) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 28, 2016. |
Oct 27 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 2, 2016) |
Nov 23 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 3, 2017. |
Dec 15 2016 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 3, 2017. |
Feb 02 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 6, 2017. |
Mar 06 2017 | Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by respondent. |
Mar 06 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Mar 15 2017 | Reply of petitioner Eric Jordan filed. |
Mar 22 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017. |
Apr 17 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017. |
Apr 24 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017. |
May 08 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017. |
May 15 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017. |
May 22 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017. |
May 30 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017. |
Jun 27 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018. |
Jun 28 2018 | Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED. |
Jun 28 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
Jul 20 2018 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 02 2018 | DISTRIBUTED. |
Aug 24 2018 | Rehearing DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Ruth J. Geller Vernet Counsel of Record | 31 Wood Lane Rockville, MD 20850 ruthv@vernetlaw.com | 301-251-9500 |
Party name: EricJordan | ||
Ruth J. Geller Vernet Counsel of Record | 31 Wood Lane Rockville, MD 20852 ruthvernet@aol.com | (301) 251-9500 |
Party name: Eric Jordan | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |