No. 16-668
Title:Emmett Magee, Petitioner
v.
Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc.
Docketed:November 21, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-31018)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 11 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2016)
Nov 23 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 20, 2017.
Jan 19 2017Brief of respondent Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc. in opposition filed.
Feb 06 2017Reply of petitioner Emmett Magee filed.
Feb 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 27 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Jul 19 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jul 31 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner Emmett Magee filed.
Aug 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Toby Heytens
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

heytens@virginia.edu
(434) 924-3229
Party name: Emmett Magee
Toby J. Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Supreme Court Litigation Clinic, 580 Massie Rd.
Charlottesville, VA 22903

heytens@virginia.edu
434-924-3229
Party name: EmmettMagee
Attorneys for Respondent
Charles Herrick Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird, LLP
1201 West Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

charlie.morgan@alston.com
0404-881-7000
Party name: Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc.
Brian David BooneAlston & Bird LLP
101 S. Tryon Street, Suite 4000
Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

brian boone@alston.com
(704) 444-1000
Party name: Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc.
Other
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States