No. 16-658
Title:Charmaine Hamer, Petitioner
v.
Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago, et al.
Docketed:November 17, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3764)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 19, 2016)
Dec 14 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 18, 2017, for all respondents.
Jan 18 2017Brief of respondents Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago & Fannie Mae in opposition filed.
Jan 30 2017Reply of petitioner Charmaine Hamer filed.
Feb 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 27 2017Petition GRANTED.
Mar 02 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Mar 08 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 15, 2017.
Mar 21 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Charmaine Hamer.
Apr 03 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Apr 11 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent Fannie Mae.
Apr 19 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party , received from counsel for respondent Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago.
May 15 2017Brief of petitioner Charmaine Hamer filed.
May 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Professor Scott Dodson in support of neither party filed.
May 19 2017Brief amicus curiae of The American Academy of Appellate Lawyers filed.
Jun 08 2017The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 31, 2017.
Jul 19 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 10, 2017.
Jul 31 2017Brief of respondents Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago, et al. filed.
Aug 01 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit.
Aug 09 2017CIRCULATED
Aug 29 2017Reply of petitioner Charmaine Hamer filed. (Distributed)
Oct 10 2017Argued. For petitioner: Jonathan A. Herstoff, New York, N. Y. For respondents: Damien G. Stewart, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Alan Herstoff
    Counsel of Record
745 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10151

jherstoff@haugpartners.com
212-588-0800
Party name: Charmaine Hamer
Attorneys for Respondents
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

lcoberly@winston.com
(312)-558-5600
Party name: Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago, et al.
Damien G. Stewart3900 Wisconsin Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20016

damien_g_stewart@fanniemae.com
202-752-6871
Party name: Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago, et al.
Other
Charles A BirdDenton, US LLP
4655 Executive Drive, Suite 700
San Diego, CA 92121

charles.bird@dentons.com
(619) 236-1414
Party name: The American Academy of Appellate Lawyers
Scott W. DodsonUniversity of California
Hastings College of Law
200 McAlister Street
San Francisco, CA 94102

dodsons@uchastings.edu
(925) 285-1445
Party name: Professor Scott Dodson in support of neither party