No. 16-6288
Title:Anselmo Solano-Cruz, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 3, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-41686)
   Decision Date:July 8, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 19 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 2, 2016)
Oct 27 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 2, 2016.
Nov 23 2016Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Dec 08 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anselmo Solano-Cruz#92643-379
FCI Pollock - Medium
P.O. Box 4050
Pollock, LA 71467

Party name: Anselmo Solano-Cruz
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States