No. 16-581
Title:Leidos, Inc., fka SAIC, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Indiana Public Retirement System, et al.
Docketed:October 31, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-4140)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:August 2, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 31 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2016)
Nov 30 2016Brief amici curiae of The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Nov 30 2016Waiver of right of respondent Indiana Public Retirement System, et al. to respond filed.
Nov 30 2016Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Dec 07 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Dec 08 2016Response Requested. (Due January 9, 2017)
Dec 16 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 8, 2017.
Feb 08 2017Brief of respondents Indiana Public Retirement System, et al. in opposition filed.
Feb 21 2017Reply of petitioner Leidos, Inc., fka SAIC, Inc. filed.
Feb 22 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 27 2017Petition GRANTED.
May 08 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 21, 2017.
May 08 2017The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 31, 2017.
Jun 20 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Petitioner and the Respondent.
Jun 21 2017Joint appendix filed (3 Volumes). (Statement of costs filed).
Jun 21 2017Brief of petitioner Leidos, Inc., fka SAIC, Inc. filed.
Jun 28 2017Brief amici curiae of The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Jun 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Jun 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Business Roundtable filed.
Jun 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Jun 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Society for Corporate Governance filed.
Jun 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Aug 31 2017Brief of respondents IN Public Retirement, System et al. filed.
Aug 31 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 6, 2017.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Sep 07 2017Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Institutional Investors filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Professors at Law and Business Schools filed.
Sep 07 2017CIRCULATED
Sep 12 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Sep 15 2017Records received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit is electronic.
Oct 02 2017Reply of petitioner Leidos, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 06 2017Motion of the parties to remove the case from the argument calendar and hold in abeyance any further proceedings filed.
Oct 10 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 17 2017The joint motion to remove the case from the argument calendar and hold in abeyance any further proceedings GRANTED.
Oct 17 2017This case is removed from the argument calendar for Monday, November 6, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew S. Tulumello
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

atulumello@gibsondunn.com
Party name: Leidos, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
(202)-326-7951
Party name: IN Public Retirement, et al.
Douglas WilensRobbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP
120 E. Palmetto Park Road
Suite 500
Boca Raton, FL 33432

dwilens@rgrdlaw.com
(561) 750-3000
Party name: Indiana Public Retirement System, et al.
Other
J. Robert Brown Jr.
    Counsel of Record
University of Denver Sturm College of Law
2255 E. Evans Avenue
Denver, CO 80206

jbrown@law.du.edu
(303)-871-6254
Party name: Professors at Law and Business Schools
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jonathan S. Massey
    Counsel of Record
Massey & Gail, LLP
1325 G Street, N.W., Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

jmassey@masseygail.com
202-652-4511
Party name: Institutional Investors
Edward Joseph FuhrHunton & Williams, LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219

(804) 788-8200
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers
Beth HeifetzJones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

bheifetz@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: The Business Roundtable
William M. JayGoodwin Procter LLP
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

wjay@goodwinlaw.com
(202) 346-4000
Party name: The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al.
Lewis J. LimanCleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006-1470

llimon@cgsh.com
(212) 225-2000
Party name: The Society for Corporate Governance
Lyle RobertsCooley LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., Ste. 700
Washington, DC 20004

lroberts@cooley.com
(202) 842-7855
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Gordon D. ToddSidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

gtodd@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.