No. 16-534
Title:Jenny Rubin, et al., Petitioners
v.
Islamic Republic of Iran, et al.
Docketed:October 19, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-1935)
   Decision Date:July 19, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 17 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2016)
Nov 16 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 25, 2016, for all respondents.
Nov 22 2016Brief of respondent Field Museum of Natural History in opposition filed.
Nov 23 2016Brief of respondent Islamic Republic of Iran filed.
Nov 23 2016Brief of respondent The University of Chicago in opposition filed.
Dec 06 2016Reply of petitioners Jenny Rubin, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 07 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Dec 09 2016Letter of December 6, 2016, from counsel for petitioners received. (Distributed)
Jan 09 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
May 23 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jun 06 2017Supplemental brief of petitioners Jenny Rubin, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2017.
Jun 27 2017Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jul 31 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 1, 2017.
Jul 31 2017The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including October 23, 2017.
Aug 23 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Jenny Rubin, et al.
Sep 01 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent Islamic Republic of Iran.
Sep 01 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Jenny Rubin, et al.
Sep 01 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Field Museum of Natural History on 09/13/2017
Sep 01 2017Brief of petitioner Jenny Rubin, et al. filed.
Sep 05 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, University of Chicago on 09/12/2017
Sep 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Foundation for Defense of Democracies filed.
Sep 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Victims of Iranian Terrorism filed.
Sep 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Former U.S. Counterterrorism Officials, et al. filed.
Sep 13 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jenny Rubin, et al. on 09/13/2017
Sep 25 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Oct 06 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, December 4, 2017.
Oct 20 2017CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Asher Perlin
    Counsel of Record
4600 Sheridan St., Suite 303
Hollywood, FL 33021

asher@asherperlin.com
954-284-0900
Party name: Jenny Rubin, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Susan Marie Benton
    Counsel of Record
Butler Rubin Saltarelli & Boyd, LLP
321 North Clark Street, Suite 400
Chicago, IL 60654

sbenton@butlerrubin.com
(312) 696-4481
Party name: Field Museum of Natural History
Susan M. Benton
    Counsel of Record
Butler Rubin Saltarelli & Boyd, LLP
321 N. Clark St., Ste. 400
Chicago, IL 60654

sbenton@butlerrubin.com
(312) 696-4481
Party name: Field Museum of Natural History
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
(202) 556-2000
Party name: Islamic Republic of Iran
David Aaron Strauss
    Counsel of Record
1111 East 60th Street
Chicago, IL 60637

d-strauss@uchicago.edu
(773-702-9601
Party name: University of Chicago
Matthew AllisonBaker & McKenzie LLP
300 East Randolph St., Suite 5000

Chicago, IL 60601

(312) 861-8000
Party name: The University of Chicago
Other
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, P.C.
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Former U.S. Counterterrorism Officials, et al.
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
(202)-887-3680
Party name: Victims of Iranian Terrorism
Kent A. Yalowitz
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
250 West 55th Street
New York, NY 10019

Kent.Yalowitz@apks.com
212-836-8000
Party name: Foundation for Defense of Democracies
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States