No. 16-499
Title:Joseph Jesner, et al., Petitioners
v.
Arab Bank, PLC
Docketed:October 13, 2016
Linked with 16A82
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-3605, 13-3620, 13-3635, 13-4650, 13-4652)
   Decision Date:December 8, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:May 9, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 20 2016Application (16A82) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 7, 2016 to October 6, 2016, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Jul 22 2016Application (16A82) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until October 6, 2016.
Oct 05 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 14, 2016)
Oct 14 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Oct 28 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 14, 2016.
Nov 11 2016Brief amici curiae of Professors of Legal History William R. Casto, et al. filed.
Nov 14 2016Brief amici curiae of International Law Scholars filed.
Nov 14 2016Brief amicus curiae of Senator Sheldon Whitehouse filed.
Nov 14 2016Brief amici curiae of Jack Bloom and Alpha Capital Holdings, Inc. filed.
Dec 14 2016Brief of respondent Arab Bank, PLC in opposition filed.
Dec 22 2016Reply of petitioners Joseph Jesner, et al. filed.
Dec 28 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 10 2017Rescheduled.
Mar 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Apr 03 2017Petition GRANTED.
Apr 27 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 20, 2017.
Apr 27 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 21, 2017.
Apr 27 2017Petitioners will file the reply brief on or before September 18, 2017.
May 09 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Jun 09 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent.
Jun 20 2017Joint appendix filed. (2 Volumes)
Jun 20 2017Brief of petitioners Joseph Jesner, et al. filed.
Jun 21 2017Brief amici curiae of Admiralty Law Professors, Thomas J. Schoenbaum, George Rutherglen, and Joel Samuels filed.
Jun 26 2017Brief amici curiae of Ambassador David J. Scheffer, et al. filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Canadian International and National Law Scholars filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Comparative Law Scholars and Practitioners filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Jack Bloom and Alpha Capital Holdings, Inc. filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of EarthRights International filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of Yale Law School Center for Global Legal Challenges filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of Former U.S. Counterterrorism and National Security Officials filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Interfaith Center on Corporate Responsibility (ICCR), et al. filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Senators Sheldon Whitehouse and Lindsey Graham filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Procedural and Corporate Law Professors filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Center for Constitional Rights, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Financial Regulation Scholars and Former Government Officials filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of International Law Scholars filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Nuremberg Scholars filed.
Jun 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Professors of Legal History filed.
Jul 19 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 11, 2017.
Aug 01 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Aug 11 2017Record received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit. The record is electronic.
Aug 14 2017CIRCULATED.
Aug 21 2017Brief of respondent Arab Bank, PLC filed. (Distributed)
Aug 24 2017Brief amici curiae of Professors of International Law, Foreign Relations Law, and Federal Jurisdiction filed. (Distributed)
Aug 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of Union of Arab Banks filed. (Distributed)
Aug 28 2017Brief amici curiae of Former State Department Officials filed. (Distributed)
Aug 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of Institute of International Bankers filed. (Distributed)
Aug 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of Central Bank of Jordan filed. (Distributed)
Aug 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of Hashemite Kingdom of Jordan filed. (Distributed)
Aug 28 2017Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Sep 08 2017Reply of petitioners Joseph Jesner, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 25 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 11 2017Argued. For petitioners: Jeffrey L. Fisher, Stanford, Cal. For United States, as amicus curiae: Brian H. Fletcher, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@stanford.edu
650-724-7081
Party name: Joseph Jesner, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
202-879-5000
Party name: Arab Bank, PLC
Other
Samuel Estreicher
    Counsel of Record
NYU School of Law
40 Washington Sq. South
New York, NY 10012

samuel.estreicher@nyu.edu
212-998-6226
Party name: Professors of International Law, Foreign Relations Law, and Federal Jurisdiction
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: the United States in support of neither party
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

douglas.hallward-driemeier@ropesgray.com
(202)-508-4600
Party name: Union of Arab Banks
Neal K. Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5600
Party name: Hashemite Kingdom of Jordan
Michael K. Kellogg
    Counsel of Record
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
(202) 326-7900
Party name: Former State Department Officials
Richard C. Pepperman
    Counsel of Record
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

212-558-4000
Party name: Institute of International Bankers
William Emmet White
    Counsel of Record
1101 New York Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

william.white@allenovery.com
202-683-3800
Party name: Central Bank of Jordan
William J. AcevesCalifornia Western School of Law
225 Cedar Street
San Diego, CA 92101

wja@cwsl.edu
(619) 515-1589
Party name: International Law Scholars
Sarah P. AlexanderConstantine Cannon LLP
150 California Street,
Suite 1600
San Francisco, CA 94111

spalexander@constantinecannon.com
(415) 766-3564
Party name: Professors of Legal History
Carey R. D'Avino43 West 43rdsStreet
New York,, NY 10036

crdavino@gmail.com
(212) 709-8163
Party name: Canadian International and National Law Scholars
William S. Dodge400 Mrak Hall Drive
Davis, CA 95616

wsdodge@ucdavis.edu
(530) 752-1910
Party name: International Law Scholars
Agnieszka M. FryszmanCohen Milstein Hausfeld & Toll PLLC
1100 New York Avenue, N. W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

afryszman@cohenmilstein.com
(202) 408-4600
Party name: Comparative Law Scholars and Practitioners
Katherine M. GallagherCenter for Constitutional Rights
666 Broadway, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10012

kgallagher@ccrjustice.org
(212)-614-6455
Party name: Center for Constitional Rights, et al. in support of neither party
Tyler Richard GianniniInternational Human Rights Clinic
Harvard Law School, Pound Hall 401
6 Everett Street, 3rd Floor
Cambridge, MA 02138

giannini@law.harvard.edu
(617) 495-9263
Party name: Professors of Legal History William R. Casto, et al.
Jerry S. GoldmanAnderson KIll P.C.
Anderson Kill PC
1251 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

jgoldman@andersonkill.com
(212) 278-1000
Party name: Jack Bloom and Alpha Capital Holdings, Inc.
Brianne Jenna GorodConstitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
(202) 296-6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Deepak GuptaGupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW.
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Financial Regulation Scholars and Former Government Officials
Jonathan D. HackerO'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

jhacker@omm.com
(202) 383-5300
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the Unite States of America, et al.
Oona A. Hathaway127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

oona.hathaway@yale.edu
(203) 436-1869
Party name: Yale Law School Center for Global Legal Challenges
Richard L. HerzEarthRights
1612 K Street N.W. Suite 401
Washington, DC 20006

rick@earthrights.org
(202) 466-5188
Party name: EarthRights International
Hyland HuntDeutch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
(202) 868-6838
Party name: Former U.S. Counterterrorism and National Security Officials
Edwin S. KneedlerDeputy Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States in support of neither party
Peter MarguliesRoger Williams University
School of Law
10 Metacom Avenue
Bristol, RI 02809

pmargulies@rwu.edu
(401) 254-4564
Party name: United States Senators Sheldon Whitehouse and Lindsey Graham
Daniel RosenthalJames & Hoffman, P.C.
1130 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 950
Washington, DC 20036

dmrosenthal@jamhoff.com
(202) 496-0500
Party name: Interfaith Center on Corporate Responsibility (ICCR), et al.
George A. RutherglenUniversity of Virginia School of Law
Supreme Court Litigation
580 Massie
Charlottesville, VA 22903

gar3h@virginia.edu
(434) 924-7015
Party name: Admiralty Law Professors, Thomas J. Schoenbaum, George Rutherglen, and Joel Samuels
David J. SchefferCenter for International Human Rights
Northwestern Pritzker School of Law
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

d-scheffer@law.northwestern.edu
(312) 503-2224
Party name: Ambassador David J. Scheffer, et al.
Elizabeth Van SchaackVisiting Professor of Law
Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

bethvs@stanford.edu
(650) 498-6526
Party name: Nuremberg Scholars
Amy J. WildermuthUniversity of Utah
S.J. Quinney College of Law
332 South 1400 East, Rm. 101 Room 101
Salt Lake City, UT 84112

amy.wildermuth@law.utah.edu
(801) 581-6833
Party name: Procedural and Corporate Law Professors