No. 16-466
Title:Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Petitioner
v.
Superior Court of California, San Francisco County, et al.
Docketed:October 11, 2016
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S221038)
   Decision Date:August 29, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 07 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 10, 2016)
Oct 13 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner and counsel for the respondents.
Nov 10 2016Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Nov 10 2016Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
Nov 10 2016Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al. filed.
Nov 10 2016Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Nov 10 2016Brief amicus curiae of GlaxoSmithKline, LLC filed.
Nov 15 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 9, 2016.
Dec 07 2016Brief of respondents Superior Court of California, San Francisco County, et al. in opposition filed.
Dec 20 2016Reply of petitioner Bristol-Myers Squibb Company filed.
Dec 21 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 17 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017.
Jan 19 2017Petition GRANTED.
Feb 13 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Petitioner.
Feb 13 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Respondents.
Feb 17 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, April 25, 2017
Feb 24 2017Record requested from the Supreme Court of California.
Mar 01 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Mar 01 2017Brief of petitioner Bristol-Myers Squibb Company filed.
Mar 02 2017Record received from the Supreme Court of California (1 box).
Mar 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Mar 08 2017Brief amicus curiae of GlaxoSmithKline LLC filed.
Mar 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Mar 08 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Mar 08 2017Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
Mar 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Mar 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Mar 08 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Mar 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Texas Association of Broadcasters filed.
Mar 09 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., et al.
Mar 09 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed out of time by MoneyMutual LLP.
Mar 22 2017CIRCULATED.
Mar 27 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., et al. GRANTED.
Mar 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of Alan B. Morrison filed. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2017Brief of respondents Superior Court of California, San Francisco County, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by MoneyMutual LLP GRANTED.
Apr 05 2017Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Apr 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Center for Auto Safety filed. (Distributed)
Apr 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Attorneys Information Exchange Group filed. (Distributed)
Apr 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of California Constitution Center filed. (Distributed)
Apr 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of The American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Apr 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Professors of Civil Procedure and Federal Courts filed. (Distributed)
Apr 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Public Justice, P.C. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization filed. (Distributed)
Apr 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Civil Procedure Professors filed. (Distributed)
Apr 11 2017Response of respondents to motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Apr 12 2017Reply of Acting Solicitor General to respondents' response to motion filed.
Apr 13 2017Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Apr 18 2017Reply of petitioner Bristol-Myers Squibb Company filed. (Distributed)
Apr 25 2017Argued. For petitioner: Neal K. Katyal, Washington, D. C.; and Rachel P. Kovner, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Thomas C. Goldstein, Bethesda, Md.
Jun 19 2017Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Thomas, Ginsburg, Breyer, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
Jul 21 2017MANDATE ISSUED.
Jul 21 2017JUDGMENT ISSUED.
Aug 07 2017Record from the Supreme Court of California has ben returned.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tg@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Superior Court of California, San Francisco County, et al.
Other
Louis M. BogradMotley Rice, LLC
401 9th Street,nw, Suite 10013869623

Washington, DC 20004

lbograd@motleyrice.com
(202) 386-9623
Party name: Public Justice, P.C.
Pamela Karten BookmanTemple University
Beasley School of Law
1719North Broad Street
Philadelphia, PA 19122

pamela.bookman@temple.edu
(215) 204-8983
Party name: Civil Procedure Professors
Jeffrey S. BucholtzKing & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

jbucholtz@kslaw.com
(202) 626-0500
Party name: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Larry CobenAnapol Weiss
8700 E. Vista Bonita Drive Suite 268
Scottsdale, AZ 85255

lcben@anapolweiss.com
480-515-4745
Party name: The Center for Auto Safety
Lawrence S. EbnerCapital Appellate Advocacy, PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
(202) 729-6337
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Noel J. FranciscoUnited States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States
David C. FrederickKellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
(202) 326-7900
Party name: TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., et al.
John Blaise GsangerThe Edwards Law Firm
Frost Bank Plaza, Ste. 1400 (78470)
P.O. Drawer 480
Corpus Christi, TX 78403

(361) 698-7600
Party name: Attorneys Information Exchange Group
Mark HaddadSidley Austin LLP
555 West Fifth Street
Los Angeles, CA 90013

mhaddad@sidley.com
(213) 896-6604
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Allan Ides919 Albany Street
Los Angeles, CA 90015

allan.ides@lls.edu
(323) 793-6845
Party name: Professors of Civil Procedure and Federal Courts
Erik S. JaffeErik S. Jaffe, P.C.
5101 34th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20008

jaffe@esjpc.com
(202) 237-8165
Party name: California Constitution Center
Martin S. KaufmanAtlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue, Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
(914) 834-3322
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al.
Rachel Peter Kovner950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20530

rachel.kovner@usdoj.gov
(202) 514-8469
Party name: United States
Thomas S. LeatherburyVinson & Elkins LLP
Trammel Crow Center
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700
Dallas, TX 75201

tleatherbury@velaw.com
(214) 320-7700
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Texas Association of Broadcasters
Jonathan S. MasseyMassey & Gail, LLP
1325 G Street, NW, Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

jmassey@masseygail.com
(202) 652-4511
Party name: MoneyMutual LLP
Jonathan S. MasseyMassey & Gail, LLP
1325 G Street, NW, Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

jmassey@masseygail.com
(202) 652-4511
Party name: MoneyMutual LLP
Alan B. MorrisonGeorge Washington University Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
(202) 994-5157
Party name: Alan B. Morrison
Robert S. PeckCenter for Constitutional Litigation, P.C.
7916 Bressingham Drinve
Faifax Station, VA 22039

robert.peck@cclfirm.com
(202) 944-2874
Party name: The American Association for Justice
Joel Gerard PieperWomble Carlyle, Sandridge & Rice, LLP
271 17th Street, N.W., Suite 2400
Atlanta, GA 30363

jpieper@wcsr.com
(404) 872-7000
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
Andrew J. PincusMayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Brent M. RosenthalRosenthal Weiner LLP
12221 Merit Dr., Suite 1640
Dallas, TX 75251

brent@rosenthalweiner.com
(214) 871-6600
Party name: Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization
Richard A. SampWashington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

rsamp@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation, et al.
Alan E. UntereinerRobbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
1801 K Street, N.W., Suite 411L
Washington, DC 20006

auntereiner@robbinsrussell.com
(202) 775-4500
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
Jeffrey B. WallUnited States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: the United States