No. 16-460
Title:Stephanie C. Artis, Petitioner
v.
District of Columbia
Docketed:October 7, 2016
Lower Ct:District of Columbia Court of Appeals
   Case Numbers:(15-CV-0243)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 06 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 7, 2016)
Oct 19 2016Waiver of right of respondent District of Columbia to respond filed.
Nov 02 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016.
Nov 03 2016Response Requested.(Due December 5, 2016)
Dec 01 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 4, 2017.
Jan 04 2017Brief of respondent District of Columbia in opposition filed.
Jan 17 2017Reply of petitioner Stephanie C. Artis filed.
Jan 18 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 27 2017Petition GRANTED.
Mar 29 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 25, 2017.
Mar 29 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 11, 2017.
May 11 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Stephanie C. Artis.
May 25 2017Brief of petitioner Stephanie C. Artis filed.
May 30 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Aug 11 2017Brief of respondent District of Columbia filed.
Aug 18 2017Motion of Wisconsin and 23 other states for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed.
Aug 18 2017Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed.
Aug 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Wisconsin and 23 other states filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

aunikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Stephanie C.Artis
Attorneys for Respondent
Todd Sunhwae Kim
    Counsel of Record
441 4th Street, NW
Suite 600 South
Washington, DC 20001

todd.kim@dc.gov
(202)-734-6609
Party name: District of Columbia
Other
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Dept. of Justice
Post Office Box 7857
Madison, WI 53703

608 267-9323
Party name: Wisconsin and 23 other states
Katharine Minkel Mapes1875 Eye Street, NW, Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006

katharine.mapes@spiegelmcd.com
202-879-4000
Party name: National Conference of State Legislatures, et al.