No. 16-424
Title:Rodney Class, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 30, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3015)
   Decision Date:July 5, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 30 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 31, 2016)
Oct 27 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 30, 2016.
Nov 16 2016Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 20, 2016.
Dec 20 2016Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jan 03 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017.
Jan 03 2017Reply of petitioner Rodney Class filed. (Distributed)
Feb 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017Petition GRANTED.
Mar 15 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 12, 2017.
Mar 15 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 17, 2017.
May 12 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received.)
May 12 2017Brief of petitioner Rodney Class filed.
May 12 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party from counsel for the petitioner.
May 19 2017Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Criminal Lawyers, et al. filed.
May 19 2017Brief amicus curiae of Albert W. Alschuler filed.
May 19 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Innocence Project filed.
Jul 17 2017Brief of respondent United States filed.
Jul 19 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 4, 2017.
Aug 01 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit.
Aug 09 2017CIRCULATED
Aug 16 2017Reply of petitioner Rodney Class filed. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Reply of Rodney Class submitted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

jamunson@jenner.com
(202)-639-6023
Party name: Rodney Class
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
1099 New York Ave., NW., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

trent.mccotter@jenner.com
202-637-6333
Party name: RodneyClass
Jessica Ring AmunsonJenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

jamunson@jenner.com
(202) 639-6000
Party name: Rodney Class
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Albert Alschuler220 Tuttle Road
Cumberland, ME 04021

a-alschuler@law.northwestern.edu
(207) 829-3963
Party name: Albert W. Alschuler
James C. DuganWillkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

jdugan@willkie.com
(212) 728-8000
Party name: The Innocence Project
Daniel N. LermanRobbins Russell Englert Orseck & Sauber LLP
1801 K Street, NW, Suite 411L
Washington, DC 20006

dlerman@robbinsrussell.com
(202)-775-4500
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Lawyers, et al.