No. 16-402
Title:Timothy Ivory Carpenter, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 28, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-1572)
   Decision Date:April 13, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:June 29, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 26 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2016)
Oct 21 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 28, 2016.
Oct 28 2016Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed.
Oct 28 2016Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Nov 21 2016Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 28, 2016.
Dec 15 2016Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 27, 2016.
Jan 27 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Feb 10 2017Reply of petitioner Timothy Ivory Carpenter filed.
Feb 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Feb 23 2017Rescheduled.
Mar 22 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
May 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 22 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
Jun 05 2017Petition GRANTED.
Jun 22 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 7, 2017.
Jun 22 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 25, 2017.
Jul 11 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party received from counsel for the petitioner.
Jul 12 2017Motion for leave to proceed further herein in forma pauperis filed by petitioner Timothy I. Carpenter.
Jul 12 2017Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner Timothy I. Carpenter.
Jul 26 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either or neither party received from counsel for the respondent.
Aug 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 07 2017Joint appendix filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief of petitioner Timothy I. Carpenter filed.
Aug 11 2017Brief amici curiae of Data & Society Research Institute and Fifteen scholars of Technology and Society filed.
Aug 11 2017Brief amici curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Democracy and Technology filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Empirical Fourth Amendment Scholars filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of The Center for Competitive Politics, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Scholars of the History and Original Meaning of the Fourth Amendment filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Technology Companies in support of neither party filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Criminal Procedure and Privacy filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Restore the Fourth, Inc. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Justice Foundation, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Technology Experts filed.
Sep 25 2017Brief of respondent United States filed.
Sep 29 2017Brief amicus curiae of Michael Varco filed.
Oct 02 2017Motion for leave to proceed further herein in forma pauperis granted by the Court
Oct 02 2017Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner GRANTED and Harold Gurewitz, Esquire, of Detroit, Michigan, is appointed to serve as counsel for the petitioner in this case.
Oct 02 2017Brief amici curiae of Alabama, et al. filed.
Oct 02 2017Brief amicus curiae of Professor Orin S. Kerr filed.
Oct 02 2017Brief amicus curiae of National District Attorneys Association filed.
Oct 06 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, November 29, 2017
Oct 12 2017CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Harold Gurewitz
    Counsel of Record
333 West Fort St., Suite 1400
Detroit, MI 48226

hgurewitz@grplc.com
313-628-4733
Party name: Timothy I. Carpenter
Nathan F. WesslerACLU Foundation
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

nwessler@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: Timothy Ivory Carpenter
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Amitabh Agarwal
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

Amit.Agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
(850) 414-3688
Party name: The States of Alabama, et al.
John M. Castellano
    Counsel of Record
125-01 Queens Boulevard
Kew Gardens, NY 11415

jmcastellano@queensda.org
718-286-5801
Party name: National District Attorneys Association
Andrew Gellis Crocker
    Counsel of Record
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

andrew@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al.
James W. Harper
    Counsel of Record
1310 L St., NW, 7th Fl.
Washington, DC 20005

jim.harper@cei.org
202-331-1010
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute, et al.
Dorothy Alicia Hickok
    Counsel of Record
One Logan Square
Philadelphia, PA 19103

alicia.hickok@dbr.com
(215)-988-2700
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Wesley Patrick Hottot
    Counsel of Record
10500 Northeast 8th St., Suite 1760
Bellevue, WA 98004

whottot@ij.org
425-646-9300
Party name: Institute for Justice, et al.
Orin S. Kerr
    Counsel of Record
2000 H Street, NW
Washington, DC 20052

okerr@law.gwu.edu
(202) 994-4775
Party name: Professor Orin S. Kerr
Robert Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: United States Justice Foundation, et al.
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Center for Democracy & Technology
Marc Rotenberg
    Counsel of Record
1718 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20009

rotenberg@epic.org
202-483-1140
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al.
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

hsandick@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: Scholars of Criminal Procedure and Privacy
Sarah O'Rourke Schrup
    Counsel of Record
Northwestern Supreme Court Practicum
357 East Chicago Ave.
Chicago, IL 60611

s-schrup@law.northwestern.edu
(312)-503-0063
Party name: Empirical Fourth Amendment Scholars
Andrew David Selbst
    Counsel of Record
36 W. 20th Street, 11th Fl.
New York, NY 10011

andrew@datasociety.net
617-504-1982
Party name: Data & Society Research Institute and fifteen scholars of technology and society
Mahesha Padmanabhan Subbaraman
    Counsel of Record
222 S. 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

mps@subblaw.com
612-315-9210
Party name: Restore the Fourth, Inc.
Michael Anthony Varco
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 2548
Reston, VA 20195

m_varco@yahoo.com
703-635-7903
Party name: Michael Varco
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Technology Companies in support of neither party
Alexander Abraham Abdo535 West 116th Street
314 Low Library
New York, NY 10027

alex.abdo@knightcolumbia.org
212-854-9600
Party name: Technology Experts
Gorod BrianneConstitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW, Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstition.org
292-296-6889
Party name: Scholars of History and Original Meaning of the Fourth Amendment
Bruce D. Brown1156 15th St., NW
Suite 1250
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
202-795-9300
Party name: The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al.
Allen Joseph DickersonCenter for Competitive Politics
124 S. West Street
Suite 201
Alexandria, VA 22314

adickerson@campaignfreedom.org
(703)-894-6800
Party name: The Center for Competitive Politics, et al.
James W. HarperCato Institute
1000 Massachuetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

jharper@cato.org
(202) 842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute
Jennifer LynchElectronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

jlynch@eff.org
(415)-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al.