No. 16-388 | |
Title: | Connie Patterson, et al., Petitioners v. Raymours Furniture Company, Inc. |
Docketed: | September 26, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (15-2820) |
Decision Date: | September 2, 2016 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 22 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 26, 2016) |
Oct 20 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 28, 2016. |
Nov 23 2016 | Brief of respondent Raymours Furniture Company, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Dec 07 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. |
Jan 09 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017. |
Apr 30 2018 | Stipulation to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 filed. |
Main Document | |
May 09 2018 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Michael Rubin Counsel of Record | Altshuler Berzon LLP 177 Post Street, Suite 300 San Francisco, CA 94108 | (415) 421-7151 |
Party name: Connie Patterson, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
David M. Wirtz Counsel of Record | Littler Mendelson, P.C. 900 Third Avenue New York, NY 10022 DWirtz@littler.com | 2125839600 |
Party name: Raymours Furniture Co. | ||
David M. Wirtz Counsel of Record | Littler Mendelson, P.C. 900 Third Avenue New York, NY 10022 dwirtz@littler.com | (212) 583-2699 |
Party name: Raymours Furniture Company, Inc. |