No. 16-32
Title:Kindred Nursing Centers Limited Partnership, dba Winchester Centre for Health and Rehabilitation, nka Fountain Circle Health and Rehabilitation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Janis E. Clark, et al.
Docketed:July 6, 2016
Linked with 15A1154
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kentucky
   Case Numbers:(2013-SC-000430-I, 2013-SC-000431-I)
   Decision Date:September 24, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:February 18, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 06 2016Application (15A1154) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 18, 2016 to July 1, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
May 09 2016Application (15A1154) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 1, 2016.
Jul 01 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 5, 2016)
Jul 29 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2016.
Aug 05 2016Brief amici curiae of American Health Care Association and The Kentucky Association of Health Care Facilities filed.
Aug 05 2016Brief amici curiae of Genesis Healthcare, Inc, et al. filed.
Sep 06 2016Brief of respondents Janis E. Clark, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 20 2016Reply of petitioners Kindred Nursing Centers Limited Partnership, dba Winchester Centre for Health and Rehabilitation, nka Fountain Circle Health and Rehabilitation, et al. filed.
Sep 21 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2016.
Oct 04 2016Rescheduled.
Oct 11 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 14, 2016.
Oct 21 2016Supplemental brief of petitioners Kindred Nursing Centers Limited Partnership, dba Winchester Centre for Health and Rehabilitation, nka Fountain Circle Health and Rehabilitation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 24 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 28, 2016.
Oct 28 2016Petition GRANTED.
Dec 07 2016Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Dec 07 2016Brief of petitioners Kindred Nursing Centers Limited Partnership, dba Winchester Centre for Health and Rehabilitation, nka Fountain Circle Health and Rehabilitation, et al. filed.
Dec 12 2016Brief amici curiae of Genesis Healthcare, Inc, et al. filed.
Dec 14 2016Brief amici curiae of American Health Care Association and The Kentucky Association of Health Care Facilities filed.
Dec 14 2016Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Dec 22 2016SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, February 22, 2017.
Dec 30 2016Record requested from the Supreme Court of Kentucky.
Jan 06 2017Brief of respondents Janis E. Clark, et al. filed.
Jan 11 2017Record received from the Supreme Court of Kentucky, 1 Box.
Jan 13 2017Brief amici curiae of American Association for Justice, and Kentucky Justice Association filed.
Jan 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of Arbitration Scholar Imre S.Szalai filed.
Jan 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed.
Jan 13 2017Brief amici curiae of AARP,et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 17 2017Record received from the Court of Appeals of Kentucky (1 envelope).
Jan 17 2017CIRCULATED.
Jan 19 2017Supplemental brief of respondents Janis E. Clark, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 06 2017Reply of petitioners Kindred Nursing Centers Limited Partnership, dba Winchester Centre for Health and Rehabilitation, nka Fountain Circle Health and Rehabilitation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 22 2017Argued. For petitioners: Andrew J. Pincus, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Robert E. Salyer, Lexington, Ky.
May 15 2017Adjudged to be REVERSED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, and case REMANDED. Kagan, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Ginsburg, Breyer, Alito, and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Gorsuch, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the case.
Jun 19 2017JUDGMENT ISSUED
Jun 19 2017MANDATE ISSUED.
Aug 11 2017Record from the Supreme Court of Kentucky has been returned.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew J. Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Kindred Nursing Centers Limited Partnership. dba Winchester Centre for Health and Rehabilitation, nka Fountain Circle Health and Rehabilitation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert E. Salyer
    Counsel of Record
429 North Broadway
PO Box 1747
Lexington, KY 40588

rsalyer@wilkesmchugh.com
(859) 455-3356
Party name: Janis E. Clark, et al.
Other
Thomas R. McCarthyConsovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Donald L. Miller II.Quintairos Prieto Wood & Boyer PA
9300 Shelbyville Road, Suite 400
Louisville, KY 40222

dmiller@qpwblaw.com
(502) 423-6390
Party name: Genesis Healthcare, Inc, et al.
Scott L. NelsonPublic Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
(202) 588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
Robert S. PeckCenter for Constitutional Litigation P.C.
7916 Bressingham Drive
Fairfax Station,, VA 22039

robert.peck@cclfirm.com
(202) 944-2874
Party name: American Association for Justice, and Kentucky Justice Association
William Alvarado RiveraAARP Foundation Litigation
601 E Street, NW,
Washington, DC 20049

warivera@aarp.org
(202)-690-6229
Party name: AARP,et al.
James F. SegrovesHooper, Lundy & Bookman, PC
401 Ninth Street, NW, Suite 550
Washington, DC 20004

jsegroves@health-law.com
(202) 580-7700
Party name: American Health Care Association and The Kentucky Association of Health Care Facilities
Imre S SzalaiLoyola University New Orleans College of Law
7214 St. Charles Avenue, Box 901
New Orleans, LA 70118

iszalai@loyno.edu
(504) 861-5589
Party name: Arbitration Scholar Imre S..Szalai