No. 16-300
Title:Ernst & Young LLP, et al., Petitioners
v.
Stephen Morris, et al.
Docketed:September 8, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-16599)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 08 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2016)
Sep 21 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Sep 29 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents
Oct 03 2016Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Oct 03 2016Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Oct 06 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 14, 2016.
Oct 07 2016Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Defense Counsel filed.
Oct 10 2016Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Oct 11 2016Brief amicus curiae of The Employers Group filed.
Oct 11 2016Brief amicus curiae of The Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Oct 11 2016Brief amicus curiae of The Business Roundtable filed.
Oct 11 2016Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Nov 15 2016Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 21, 2016.
Nov 21 2016Brief of respondents Stephen Morris, et al. in support of granting the petition for a writ of certiorari filed.
Dec 06 2016Reply of petitioners Ernst & Young LLP, et al. filed.
Dec 07 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 13 2017Petition GRANTED The petition for a writ of certiorari in Nos. 16-285 and 16-307 are granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Jan 25 2017The following briefing schedule is adopted: Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and respondents in No. 16-307 will file opening and reply briefs under the schedule set forth in Rules 25.1 and 25.3. Respondents in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and petitioner in No. 16-307 will file response briefs under the schedule set forth in Rule 25.2. VIDED.
Feb 02 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs,in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners Ernst & Young LLP, et al.
Feb 21 2017The time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs is extended to and including April 28, 2017. VIDED.
Feb 21 2017The time to file the response briefs is extended to and including July 27, 2017. VIDED.
Apr 13 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party from counsel for respondents Morris, et al.
Apr 28 2017The time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs is further extended to and including June 9, 2017. VIDED.
Apr 28 2017The time to file the response briefs is further extended to and including August 9, 2017. VIDED.
Jun 09 2017Joint appendix for Ernst & Young LLP, et al. filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Jun 09 2017Brief of petitioners Ernst & Young LLP, et al. filed.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Council on Labor Law Equality, et al. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Bristol Farms filed. VIDED
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of the United States supporting Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and supporting Respondents in No. 16-307 filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Business Roundtable supporting Epic Systems Corp., Ernst & Young LLP, and Murphy Oil USA, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Employers Group in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent Murphy Oil in No. 16-307 filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent Murphy Oil USA,Inc. in No.16-307 filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of HR Policy Association filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of DRI-Voice of the Defense Bar filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Defense Counsel filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of American Staffing Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Mortgage Bankers Association and State Mortgage Lending Assocaions filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Jul 19 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, October 2, 2017. VIDED.
Aug 01 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Aug 01 2017Records from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit are electronic and located on PACER.
Aug 09 2017Brief of respondents Stephen Morris, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Aug 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Academy of Arbitrators filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017CIRCULATED.
Aug 15 2017Brief amici curiae of Ten International Labor Unions, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Labor Law Professors filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Motion for divided argument filed by NLRB. VIDED.
Aug 16 2017Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Maryland, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Main Street Alliance, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Susan Fowler filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of New York Taxi Workers Alliance filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon Kumar Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
655 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202)-662-5050
Party name: Ernst & Young, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Max Folkenflik
    Counsel of Record
1500 Broadway, 21st floor
New York, NY 10036

max@fmlaw.net
(212)-757-0400
Party name: Stephen Morris, et al.
Harold C. Becker815 16th St., NW
Washington, DC 20006

cbecker@aflcio.org
(202) 637-5000
Party name: Sheila M. Hobson
Richard Francis Griffin1015 Half Street, SE
Washington, DC 20570

richard.griffin@nlrb.gov
202-273-3705
Party name: NLRB
Other
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
(202)-326-7900
Party name: Labor Law Professors
Michael Harrison Rubin
    Counsel of Record
177 Post Street, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

mrubin@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: Ten International Labor Unions, et al.
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: the United States
David M. AxelradHorvitz & Levy LLP
3601 W. Olive Ave., 8th floor
Burbank, CA 91505-468

daxelrad@horvitzlevy.com
(818) 995-0800
Party name: DRI-Voice of the Defense Bar
Edward Fouad BerbarieLittler Mendelson, P.C.
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 1500, Lock Box 116
Dallas, TX 75201-2931

eberbarie@littler.com
(214)-880-8100
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
Matthew William FinkinUniversity of Illinois College of Law
504 East Pennsylvania Avenue
Champaign, IL 61820

mfinkin@illinois.edu
(217)-333-3884
Party name: National Academy of Arbitrators
Stephen Andrew FogdallSchnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
1600 Market Street Suite 3600
Philadelphia, PA 19103

sfogdall@schnader.com
(215)-751-2581
Party name: Mortgage Bankers Association and State Mortgage Lending Assocaions
Brianne Gorod1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

Brianne@theusconstitution.org
202-296-6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Beth HeifetzJones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

bheifetz@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: The Employers Group in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent Murphy Oil in No. 16-307
William M. JayGoodwin Procter LLP
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

wjay@goodwinlaw.com
(202) 346-4000
Party name: Business Roundtable supporting Epic Systems Corp., Ernst & Young LLP, and Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Steven B. KatzConstangy Brook Smith & Prophete LLP
2029 Century Park East Suite 1100
Los Angeles, CA 90067

skatz@constangy.com
(310) 999-7775
Party name: Bristol Farms
Martin S. KaufmanAtlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue, Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
(914) 834-3322
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
John B. LewisBaker & Hostetler LLP
Key Tower, Suite 2000
127 Public Square
Cleveland, OH 44114

jlewis@bakerlaw.com
(216) 621-0200
Party name: American Staffing Association, et al.
Thomas R. McCarthyConsovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
Antonin Scalia Law School Supreme Court
3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Law Professors
Christopher Charles MurrayOgletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC.
111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600
Indianapolis, IN 46260

christoopher.murray@odnss.com
317-916-2522
Party name: Council on Labor Law Equality, et al.
Andrew J. PincusMayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Benjamin G. RobbinsNew England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111-2504

benrobbins@nelfonline.org
(617) 695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Richard A. SampWashington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

rsamp@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent Murphy Oil USA,Inc. in No.16-307
Samuel Scott ShaulsonMorgan Lewis Bockius LLP
101 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10178

sshaulson@morganlewis.com
212.309.6718
Party name: HR Policy Association
Mary-Christine SungailaHaynes and Boone, LLP
600 Anton Blvd., Suite 700
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

mc.sungaila@haynesboone.com
(949) 202-3062
Party name: International Association of Defense Counsel
Adam G. UnikowskyJenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001-4412

aunikowsky@jenner.com
(202) 639-6000
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.