No. 16-285
Title:Epic Systems Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Jacob Lewis
Docketed:September 2, 2016
Linked with 16A93
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2997)
   Decision Date:May 26, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 25 2016Application (16A93) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 24, 2016 to September 23, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jul 29 2016Application (16A93) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 23, 2016.
Sep 02 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2016)
Sep 07 2016Consent to filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Sep 20 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent.
Sep 29 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 14, 2016.
Sep 30 2016Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Sep 30 2016Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Defense Counsel filed.
Oct 03 2016Brief amicus curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council filed.
Oct 03 2016Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Oct 03 2016Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Oct 03 2016Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Oct 03 2016Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Nov 14 2016Brief of respondent Jacob Lewis in opposition filed.
Nov 29 2016Reply of petitioner Epic Systems Corporation filed.
Nov 30 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 13 2017Petition GRANTED The petition for a writ of certiorari in Nos. 16-300 and 16-307 are granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Jan 25 2017The following briefing schedule is adopted: Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and respondents in No. 16-307 will file opening and reply briefs under the schedule set forth in Rules 25.1 and 25.3. Respondents in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and petitioner in No. 16-307 will file response briefs under the schedule set forth in Rule 25.2. VIDED.
Feb 20 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Respondent.
Feb 21 2017The time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs is extended to and including April 28, 2017. VIDED.
Feb 21 2017The time to file the response briefs is extended to and including July 27, 2017. VIDED.
Apr 11 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Apr 28 2017The time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs is further extended to and including June 9, 2017. VIDED.
Apr 28 2017The time to file the response briefs is further extended to and including August 9, 2017. VIDED.
Jun 07 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Epic Systems Corporation.
Jun 09 2017Brief of petitioner Petitioner Epic Systems Corporation and Respondent Murphy Oil USA, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council filed.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Council on Labor Law Equality, et al. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of the United States supporting Petitioners in Nos.16-285 and 16- 300 and supporting Respondents in No.307 filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Business Roundtable supporting Epic Systems Corp., Ernst & Young LLP, and Murphy Oil USA, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Employers Group in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and in support of the Respondent Murphy Oil USA in No. 16-307 filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent Murphy Oil in No.16-307 filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of HR Policy Association filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Law Professors filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Mortgage Bankers Association and State Mortgage Lending Association filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Defense Counsel filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of American Staffing Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Bristol Farms filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed. VIDED.
Jul 19 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, October 2, 2017. VIDED.
Aug 01 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit.
Aug 02 2017Record received from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit is located on PACER with the exception of SEALED documents which are electronic.
Aug 09 2017Brief of respondent Jacob Lewis filed.
Aug 09 2017Record received from the U.S.D.C. Northern Dist. of Illinois is electronic.
Aug 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Academy of Arbitrators filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017CIRCULATED.
Aug 15 2017Brief amici curiae of Ten International Labor Unions, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Labor Law Professors filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Motion for divided argument filed by NLRB. VIDED.
Aug 16 2017Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Maryland, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Main Street Alliance, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Susan Fowler filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of New York Taxi Workers Alliance filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: Epic Systems Corp.
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel Roy Ortiz
    Counsel of Record
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

434-924-3127
Party name: Jacob Lewis
David C. Zoeller
    Counsel of Record
Hawks Quindel ,S.C.
222 W. Washington Ave., Suite 450
Madison, WI 53701-2155

dzoeller@hq-law.com
(608) 257-0040
Party name: Jacob Lewis
Harold C. Becker815 16th St., NW
Washington, DC 20006

cbecker@aflcio.org
(202) 637-5000
Party name: Sheila M. Hobson
Max FolkenflikFolkenflik & McGerity, LLP
1500 Broadway, Suite 812
New York, NY 10036

mfolkenflik@fmlaw.net
(212) 757-0400
Party name: Stephen Morris and Kelly McDaniel
Richard Francis Griffin Jr.1015 Half Street, SE
Washington, DC 20570

richard.griffin@nlrb.gov
202-273-3705
Party name: NLRB
Daniel R. Ortiz580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

Party name: Jacob Lewis
Jeffrey A. SchwartzJackson Lewis P.C.
1155 Peachtree St. NE, Suite 1000
Atlanta, GA 30309-3600

jschwartz@jacksonlewis.com
(404) 525-8200
Party name: Murphy Oil USA, Inc., et al.
Kannon K. ShanmugamWilliams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Ernst & Young LLP and Ernst & Young U.S. LLP
Other
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
(202)-326-7900
Party name: Labor Law Professors
Michael Harrison Rubin
    Counsel of Record
177 Post Street, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

mrubin@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: Ten International Labor Unions, et al.
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: the United States
Raymond Audain40 Rector St., 5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

raudain@naacpldf.org
212-965 -2200
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al.
David M. AxelradHorvitz & Levy LLP
3601 W. Olive Ave., 8th floor
Burbank, CA 91505-468

daxelrad@horvitzlevy.com
(818) 995-0800
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Samuel Robert Bagenstos625 S. State St.
Ann Arbor, MI 48109

sbagen@gmail.com
734-647-7584
Party name: Main Street Alliance
Christopher D. Baker44 Montgomery St., Suite 3520
San Francisco, CA 94104

cbaker@bakerlp.com
415-433-1064
Party name: Susan Fowler
Edward Fouad BerbarieLittler Mendelson, P.C.
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 1500, Lock Box 116
Dallas, TX 75201-2931

eberbarie@littler.com
(214)-880-8100
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
Matthew William FinkinUniversity of Illinois College of Law
504 East Pennsylvania Avenue
Champaign, IL 61820

mfinkin@illinois.edu
(217)-333-3884
Party name: National Academy of Arbitrators
Stephen Andrew FogdallSchnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
1600 Market Street Suite 3600
Philadelphia, PA 19103

sfogdall@schnader.com
(215)-751-2581
Party name: Mortgage Bankers Association and State Mortgage Lending Association
Brianne Jenna Gorod1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202-296-6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Deepak Gupta1900 L Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
202-888-1741
Party name: American Association for Justice
Beth HeifetzJones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

bheifetz@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: The Employers Group in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and in support of the Respondent Murphy Oil USA in No. 16-307
Patrick Browning Hughes200 St. Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202

phughes@oag.state.md.us
410-576-6325
Party name: Maryland, et al.
William M. JayGoodwin Procter LLP
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

wjay@goodwinlaw.com
(202) 346-4000
Party name: The Business Roundtable supporting Epic Systems Corp. Ernst & Young LLP, and Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Steven B. KatzCostangy Brook Smith & Prophete LLP
2029 Century Park East Suite 1100
Los Angeles, CA 90067

skatz@constangy.com
(310) 909-7775
Party name: Bristol Farms
Martin S. KaufmanAtlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue, Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
(914) 834-3322
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Deborah J. La FetraPacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dlafetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
John B. LewisBaker & Hostetler LLP
Key Tower, Suite 2000
127 Public Square
Cleveland, OH 44114

jlewis@bakerlaw.com
(216) 621-0200
Party name: American Staffing Association, et al.
Thomas R. McCarthyConsovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
Antonin Scalia Law School Supreme Court
3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Law Professors
Jeanne Mirer150 Broadway, Suite 1200
New York, NY 10038

jmirer@mmsjlaw.com
212-231-2235
Party name: New York Taxi Workers Alliance
Christopher Charles MurrayOgletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC.
111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600
Indianapolis, IN 46260

christoopher.murray@odnss.com
317-916-2522
Party name: Council on Labor Law Equality, et al.
Scott Lawrence Nelson1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
Andrew J. PincusMayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Benjamin G. RobbinsNew England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111-2504

benrobbins@nelfonline.org
(617) 695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Richard A. SampWashington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

rsamp@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent Murphy Oil in No.16-307
Samuel Scott ShaulsonMorgan Lewis Bockius LLP
101 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10178

sshaulson@morganlewis.com
212.309.6718
Party name: HR Policy Association
Mary-Christine SungailaHaynes and Boone, LLP
600 Anton Blvd., Suite 700
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

mc.sungaila@haynesboone.com
(949) 202-3062
Party name: International Association of Defense Counsel
Adam G. UnikowskyJenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001-4412

aunikowsky@jenner.com
(202) 639-6000
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Rae T. VannNT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, N.W.
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

rvann@ntlakis.com
(202) 629-5600
Party name: Equal Employment Advisory Council