No. 16-1548
Title:Alesteve Cleaton, Petitioner
v.
Department of Justice
Docketed:June 23, 2017
Linked with 16A1106
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-3126)
   Decision Date:October 13, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 23, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2017Application (16A1106) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 24, 2017 to June 23, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
May 15 2017Application (16A1106) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 23, 2017.
Jun 23 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2017)
Jul 20 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2017.
Aug 16 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 22, 2017.
Sep 18 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 23, 2017.
Oct 23 2017Brief of respondent Department of Justice in opposition filed.
Nov 07 2017Reply of petitioner Alesteve Cleaton filed.
Nov 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
(202)-637-2200
Party name: Alesteve Cleaton
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Justice